EP3175625 - VIDEO QUALITY MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ineoquest Technologies, Inc. 170 Forbes Boulevard Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DION, Gino Louis 11 Maria Court Quispamsis, New Brunswick E2G 0E6 / CA | 02 /
NEWTON, Stuart W. Wetherden Tumbledown Cumnor Oxford Oxfordshire OX2 9QE / GB | 03 /
HARRISON, Calvin W. 12 Tanglewood Drive Franklin, Massachusetts 02038 / US | 04 /
WELCH, James T. 1421 Green Mountain Drive Wake Forest, North Carolina 27587 / US | 05 /
DAWSON, Peter S. 1931 Washington Street Canton, Massachusetts 02021 / US | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 15827003.3 | 31.07.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015US43087 | Priority number, date | US201462031893P | 01.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462031893 P | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016019227 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3175625 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/24, H04N21/442, H04N17/00, H04L29/06 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
H04N21/2402 (EP);
H04L65/612 (EP);
H04L65/80 (EP);
H04N17/004 (EP);
H04N21/442 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/23] | H04N21/24, H04N21/442 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Title | German: | VIDEOQUALITÄTSÜBERWACHUNG | [2017/23] | English: | VIDEO QUALITY MONITORING | [2017/23] | French: | CONTRÔLE DE QUALITÉ VIDÉO | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 10.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 14.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/14] | Divisional application(s) | EP18188775.3 / EP3425909 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006088035 (BEESON JESSE D [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006184670 (BEESON JESSE D [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007128097 (MARINER PARTNERS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-40* abstract *; | [X]US2008089239 (TODD MARC A C [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009097413 (TODD MARC A C [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009300688 (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2480001 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [X] 1-40 * the whole document * | International search | [XYA]US8159960 (COOPPAN DAYALAN [US]) [X] 20, 22-25 * See column 2, lines 3-8; column 11, lines 1-3; claims 1, 11, 12; and figure 3. * [Y] 40 [A] 1-19, 21, 26-39; | [A]US8331618 (YUNG PAK WAI [US], et al) [A] 1-40* See column 3, lines 40-64; column 5, lines 1-10; and figure 3 *; | [A]US2012320222 (NAKAMICHI KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-40 * See paragraphs [0080], [0050], [0007]; and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2013286868 (OYMAN OZGUR [US], et al) [Y] 40 * See paragraph [0049]; claim 16; and figure 5. *; | [A]US2014215026 (BEESON JESSE D [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * See paragraphs [0011], [0027]; and figure 1. * |