EP3326390 - SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNALS AND CHANNEL STRUCTURE FOR NARROWBAND LTE DEPLOYMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Tao 7202 Emami Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 02 /
CHATTERJEE, Debdeep 725 Mariposa Avenue Apt. 301 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 03 /
XIONG, Gang 16682 NW Arizona Drive Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | 04 /
RASHID, Mohamad, Mamunur 6058 NE Whitewood Drive Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 15828785.4 | 23.12.2015 | [2018/22] | WO2015US00254 | Priority number, date | US201562196530P | 24.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562196530 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017018966 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3326390 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
H04W56/0005 (EP,US);
H04J11/0069 (KR);
H04L27/2613 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2692 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04W56/00 (KR);
H04J2211/005 (KR);
H04L27/26132 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISATIONSSIGNALE UND KANALSTRUKTUR FÜR SCHMALBANDIGE LTE-EINSÄTZE | [2018/22] | English: | SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNALS AND CHANNEL STRUCTURE FOR NARROWBAND LTE DEPLOYMENTS | [2018/22] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CANAL ET SIGNAUX DE SYNCHRONISATION POUR DÉPLOIEMENTS DE LTE À BANDE ÉTROITE | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 16.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 22.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2014029568 (WANG LEI [US], et al) [Y] 1,24,25 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0065] * [A] 21,23; | [YA] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group GSM/EDGE Radio Access Network; Cellular System Support for Ultra Low Complexity and Low Throughput Internet of Things; (Release 13)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 45.820, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20150714), vol. GERAN WG1, no. V1.4.0, pages 1 - 361, XP050995816 [Y] 1 * page 263, paragraph 7.3.1.1 - page 273, paragraph 7.3.2.3.3.1 * [A] 2-21,23 | [Y] - APIS TECHNICAL TRAINING AB, "LTE-Advanced: EPO in-house course", APIS TECHNICAL TRAINING AB, Stockholm, (20141231), pages 1 - 16, XP002756029 [Y] 24,25 * page 11, line 1 - line 19 * | [A] - Page, "LTE-M - Optimizing LTE for the Internet of Things White Paper Nokia Networks Nokia Networks white paper LTE-M - Optimizing LTE for the Internet of Things FutureWorks Contents", (20150501), URL: http://networks.nokia.com/sites/default/files/document/nokia_lte-m_-_optimizing_lte_for_the_internet_of_things_white_paper.pdf, (20160315), XP055258450 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * |