EP3240902 - CHITIN, HYDROLYSATE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ONE OR MORE DESIRED PRODUCTS FROM INSECTS BY MEANS OF ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ynsect 1 Rue Pierre Fontaine 91058 Évry-Courcouronnes Cedex / FR | [2020/31] |
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Ynsect 1 Rue Pierre Fontaine 91058 Evry Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEREZINA, Nathalie 3 rue Monge 75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
HUBERT, Antoine 13 chemin Latéral 94140 Alfortville / FR | 03 /
BERRO, Fabrice 15 rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau 75001 Paris / FR | 04 /
LEVON, Jean-Gabriel 102 boulevard Richard Lenoir 75011 Paris / FR | 05 /
LE ROUX, Karine 1 chemin de Chambergeot 91490 Milly La Foret / FR | 06 /
SOCOLSKY, Cecilia 5 rue Blanche 59800 Lille / FR | 07 /
SANCHEZ, Lorena 4 rue Camille Flammarion 91260 Juvisy-sur-Orge / FR | 08 /
LAURENT, Sophie 1 Boulevard Alexandre Millerand Vulcain 1, Apt 147 44200 Nantes / FR | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/45] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15828828.2 | 30.12.2015 | [2017/45] | WO2015FR53781 | Priority number, date | FR20140063512 | 31.12.2014 Original published format: FR 1463512 | [2017/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016108033 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3240902 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3240902 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/26, C08B37/08, C12P21/06 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
C08B37/003 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08B37/0003 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K14/43563 (US);
C08L5/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12P19/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12P21/06 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHITIN, HYDROLYSAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINEM ODER MEHREREN GEWÜNSCHTEN PRODUKTEN AUS INSEKTEN DURCH ENZYMATISCHE HYDROLYSE | [2017/45] | English: | CHITIN, HYDROLYSATE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ONE OR MORE DESIRED PRODUCTS FROM INSECTS BY MEANS OF ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS | [2017/45] | French: | CHITINE, HYDROLYSAT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUIT(S) D'INTÉRÊT À PARTIR D'INSECTES PAR HYDROLYSE ENZYMATIQUE | [2017/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 20.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2018 | Observations by third parties | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.07.2020 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | LU | 30.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XA]CN102558387 ; | [X]US4958011 (BADE MARIA L [US]); | [XA]CN1297691 (INST OF ZOOLOGY ACADEMIA SINIC [CN]); | [X]FR2927336 (CIE DES PECHES SAINT MALO SANT [FR]); | [XA]CN101775085 (ZHEJIANG PUJIANG CHENGYUE PLAN); | [X]CN101144097B (CHONGQING BAIAODIKE MICROECOLOGICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XA]FR2975706 (IFREMER [FR], et al); | Examination | CN103725742 | other | US4958011 | FR2927336 | US2014100361 |