EP3178647 - LAMINATE HAVING MOISTURE BARRIER PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAHARA, Naru c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research & Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 02 /
NANGOU Shunya c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research & Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 03 /
MORI, Kota c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research & Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 04 /
OKUYAMA, Shinpei c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research & Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Raynor, Stuart Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15828928.0 | 29.07.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015JP71507 | Priority number, date | JP20140161901 | 07.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014161901 | [2017/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016021459 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3178647 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/00, B32B27/18, C08J7/04 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
C08J7/048 (EP,US);
B32B9/045 (KR);
B32B27/18 (EP,KR,US);
B32B9/00 (EP,US);
C08J7/0423 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C23C14/24 (US);
C23C16/45525 (US);
C23C16/50 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | B32B9/00, B32B27/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | LAMINAT MIT FEUCHTIGKEITSSPERREIGENSCHAFTEN | [2017/24] | English: | LAMINATE HAVING MOISTURE BARRIER PROPERTIES | [2017/24] | French: | STRATIFIÉ À PROPRIÉTÉS DE BARRIÈRE CONTRE L'HUMIDITÉ | [2017/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2017 | Translation filed | 02.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 02.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2955017 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-8* paragraphs [0149] - [0167] - [0169] , [0170] , [0189] - [0210]; figures 1,2,4-10; claim -; table - *; | [E]EP3056339 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraphs [0087] , [0178] - [0182] - [0209]; figure -; examples 1-14; claims 1,2,4,8; table - * | International search | [A]JPH03182347 (DYNIC CORP) [A] 1-8 * , claims 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006168298 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , claims 1, 3, 6; examples (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2009090633 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 1-5, 7, 8 * , claims 1, 3, 8; paragraphs [0001], [0011], [0017]; examples 3, 4 (Family: none) * [A] 6; | [YA]JP2010116435 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [Y] 1-5, 7, 8 * , claims 1, 2; paragraphs [0002], [0005], [0006], [0011], [0012]; examples (Family: none) * [A] 6; | [YA]JP2010116436 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [Y] 1-5, 7, 8 * , claims 1, 3, 4, 7; paragraphs [0002], [0005], [0006], [0012], [0015]; examples (Family: none) * [A] 6; | [XA]JP2011131395 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC) [X] 1-3, 7, 8 * , claims 1, 5; paragraphs [0006], [0016], [0018], [0023]; example 3; drawings (Family: none) * [A] 4-6; | [PX]WO2015053340 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-8* , claims 1, 2, 4; paragraph [0061]; examples (Family: none) * |