EP3179477 - MAGNETIC DATA RECORDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/24] | MAGNETIC STORAGE MEDIUM AND DATA RECORDING DEVICE | ||
[2024/36] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riken 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAOSA Naoto c/o RIKEN 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 02 /
KOSHIBAE Wataru c/o RIKEN 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 03 /
IWASAKI Junichi c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 04 /
KAWASAKI Masashi c/o RIKEN 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 05 /
TOKURA Yoshinori c/o RIKEN 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 06 /
KANEKO Yoshio c/o RIKEN 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama 351-0198 / JP | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Bettinastraße 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 15829102.1 | 03.07.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015JP69339 | Priority number, date | JP20140161888 | 07.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014161888 | [2017/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016021349 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3179477 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/65, G11B5/02, G11B5/738, G11C11/18, G11B5/74, G11C19/08, G11B5/00, G11C11/16, G11C13/04, H10N50/10 | [2024/36] | CPC: |
G11C11/161 (EP,US);
G11B5/02 (EP,KR,US);
G11B5/74 (KR,US);
G11C11/1673 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/1675 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/18 (EP,KR,US);
G11C13/04 (EP,KR,US);
G11C19/0808 (EP,KR,US);
G11C19/085 (EP,KR,US);
G11C19/0858 (EP,KR,US);
H10N50/10 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2005/0021 (US);
Y10S428/90 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | G11B5/65, G11B5/02, G11B5/738, H01L43/08, G11C11/18, G11B5/74, G11C19/08, G11B5/00, G11C11/16, G11C13/04 | ||
Former IPC [2017/24] | G11B5/65, G11B5/02, G11B5/738, H01L43/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE DATENAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/36] | English: | MAGNETIC DATA RECORDING DEVICE | [2024/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNÉES | [2024/36] |
Former [2017/24] | MAGNETISCHES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND DATENAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2017/24] | MAGNETIC STORAGE MEDIUM AND DATA RECORDING DEVICE | ||
Former [2017/24] | SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE MAGNÉTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNÉES | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2017 | Translation filed | 14.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 14.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2014078637 (ROHM CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2014078560 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO); | [A]JP2014086470 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO); | [PA]JP2014175417 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO) |