EP3177371 - CABLE TREADMILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Porteros De Luz, Veronica 185 Heritage Lake Blvd. Dewinton, Alberta T0L 0X0 / CA | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [2017/24] | Application number, filing date | 15829299.5 | 04.08.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015IB55922 | Priority number, date | US201461999656P | 04.08.2014 Original published format: US 201461999656 P | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016020844 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3177371 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A63B22/02, A63B21/00 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
A63B21/0628 (EP,US);
A63B21/154 (US);
A63B21/4027 (US);
A63B22/0012 (EP,US);
A63B22/0023 (EP,US);
A63B22/0235 (EP,US);
A63B24/0087 (EP,US);
A63B69/0064 (EP,US);
A63B2022/0278 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0081 (EP,US);
A63B21/156 (EP,US);
A63B21/4009 (EP,US);
A63B22/0005 (EP,US);
A63B2225/09 (EP,US);
A63B2225/68 (EP,US);
A63B71/0622 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | KABELLAUFBAND | [2017/24] | English: | CABLE TREADMILL | [2017/24] | French: | TAPIS ROULANT CÂBLÉ | [2017/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 02.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/32] | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US8257232 (ALBERT THIERRY [FR]) [Y] Claims 1 to 4 * Figures 1 to 3 *; | [Y]US6450923 (VATTI BALA R [US]) [Y] Claims 1 to 4 * Figures 1 to 3; Abstract; Column 4, lines 11 to 20 *; | [Y]KR101355242B (KIM SEONG HWAN [KR]) [Y] Claim 4 * Figure 1; Abstract *; | [Y]US4861021 (EDWARDS MARYSUE [US], et al) [Y] Claim 3 * Figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005239607 (CHANG CHIH Y [TW]) [Y] Claims 1 to 4 * Entire document *; | [A]US2007232463 (WU YU F [TW]) [A] Claims 1 to 4 * Entire document *; | [A]US8790222 (BURGER GEORGE [US]) [A] Claims 1 to 4 * Entire document * |