EP3179308 - UNDERLAYER FILM-FORMING COMPOSITION FOR LITHOGRAPHY, UNDERLAYER FILM FOR LITHOGRAPHY, AND PATTERN FORMING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Kana c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Hiratsuka Research Laboratory 6-2 Higashiyawata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 02 /
MAKINOSHIMA, Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Hiratsuka Research Laboratory 6-2 Higashiyawata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 03 /
ECHIGO, Masatoshi c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Hiratsuka Research Laboratory 6-2 Higashiyawata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 04 /
HIGASHIHARA, Go c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Mizushima Plant 3-10 Mizushima Kaigandori Kurashiki-shi Okayama 712-8525 / JP | 05 /
OKOSHI, Atsushi c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Mizushima Plant 3-10 Mizushima Kaigandori Kurashiki-shi Okayama 712-8525 / JP | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/24] | Application number, filing date | 15829358.9 | 31.07.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015JP71855 | Priority number, date | JP20140162535 | 08.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014162535 | [2017/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016021511 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3179308 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3179308 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/11, C07C261/02, G03F7/004, G03F7/26, H01L21/027 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
G03F7/0752 (EP,US);
G03F7/11 (US);
C07C261/02 (EP,US);
C09D179/04 (US);
C09D7/20 (EP,US);
G03F7/0045 (US);
G03F7/0046 (US);
G03F7/0392 (US);
G03F7/091 (EP,US);
G03F7/094 (EP,US);
G03F7/162 (US);
G03F7/168 (US);
G03F7/2037 (US);
G03F7/322 (US);
G03F7/38 (US);
H01L21/027 (EP,US);
H01L21/0274 (US);
H01L21/3081 (US);
H01L21/3086 (US);
H01L21/31116 (US);
H01L21/31144 (US);
G03F7/0397 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERSCHICHTFILMBILDENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR LITHOGRAFIE, UNTERSCHICHTFILM FÜR LITHOGRAFIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STRUKTURFORMUNG | [2017/24] | English: | UNDERLAYER FILM-FORMING COMPOSITION FOR LITHOGRAPHY, UNDERLAYER FILM FOR LITHOGRAPHY, AND PATTERN FORMING METHOD | [2017/24] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR FORMATION DE FILM SOUS-COUCHE POUR LITHOGRAPHIE, FILM SOUS-COUCHE POUR LITHOGRAPHIE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE MOTIF | [2017/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2017 | Translation filed | 02.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 24.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2015 | AL | 21.04.2021 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | ES | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | IT | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | MT | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | PL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | TR | 21.04.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | FR | 31.07.2021 | GB | 31.07.2021 | IE | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | LU | 31.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 31.07.2015 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
TR | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
IE | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
LU | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 31.07.2015 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
IE | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
LU | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 31.07.2015 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
IE | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
LU | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 31.07.2015 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
IE | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
LU | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
IE | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
LU | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
IE | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
LU | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
LU | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
LU | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
LU | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
LU | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
GB | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1566377 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0044] - [0046]; examples A,B; claims 1-9 *; | [X]JP2006193607 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0008] - [0016]; examples 1-3; claim 1 *; | [X]US2009017316 (KATO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0017] - [0031]; claims 1-4 *; | [X]EP2219076 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-12* paragraphs [0076] , [0118] , [0140] - [0144]; examples 1-15; claims 1-17 *; | [E]EP3267256 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-12 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0080]; claims 1-13 *; | [E]EP3282319 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-12 * paragraphs [0075] - [0084] - [0129] , [0134]; examples 1-4; claims 1-12 * | International search | [A]JP2006193607 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-12 * , entire text & KR 10-2006-0082822 A & CN 1803916 A & TW 1391446 B *; | [XY]WO2009072465 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-2, 5, 8-12 * , example 20; paragraphs [0133] to [0134], [0179] & US 2010/0316950 A1 example 20; paragraphs [0139] to [0140], [0186] & JP 5370158 B & EP 2219076 A1 & KR 10-2010-0095563 A & CN 101889247 A & KR 10-2010-0107441 A & TW 200936623 A & CN 103145543 A * [Y] 12; | [A]JP2010189470 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-12* , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012212051 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [XY]WO2013036027 (DONGJIN SEMICHEM CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-11 * , paragraphs [34], [148] to [151]; tables 1, 2; example 1; formulae 1, 1d & US 2014/0227887 A1 paragraphs [0015], [0041] to [0044]; tables 1, 2; example 1; formulae 1, 1d & KR 10-2013-0026761 A & CN 103781816 A & TW 201319756 A * [Y] 12 |