EP3177488 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC VEHICLE PLATE WITH VARIABLE IMAGE USING WIRELESS POWER AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Findlay, William David 125 Brook Hollow Drive Columbia, South Carolina 29229 / US | For all designated states Bannister, Brian Mayer 153 Clearview Drive Columbia, South Carolina 29212 / US | For all designated states Butcher, Richard Raymond 301 Steeple Crest North Irmo, South Carolina 29063 / US | For all designated states Powercast Corporation 566 Alpha Drive Pittsburg, PA 15238 / US | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINDLAY, William David 125 Brook Hollow Drive Columbia, South Carolina 29229 / US | 02 /
BANNISTER, Brian Mayer 153 Clearview Drive Columbia, South Carolina 29212 / US | 03 /
BUTCHER, Richard Raymond 301 Steeple Crest North Irmo, South Carolina 26063 / US | 04 /
GREENE, Charles E. 1266 Cornplanter Road Cabot, Pennsylvania 16023 / US | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15830441.0 | 10.08.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015US44506 | Priority number, date | US201462034987P | 08.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462034987 P | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016023033 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3177488 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/10 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
B60R13/105 (EP,US);
G01S19/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR ELEKTROFAHRZEUGPLATTE MIT VARIABLEM BILD UNTER VERWENDUNG VON DRAHTLOSEM STROM UND DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONEN | [2017/24] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC VEHICLE PLATE WITH VARIABLE IMAGE USING WIRELESS POWER AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2017/24] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PLAQUE D'ÉLECTRONIQUE DE VÉHICULE À IMAGE VARIABLE UTILISANT UNE ALIMENTATION SANS FIL ET UN MOYEN DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2017/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 07.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 14.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US3895987 (LORECK WALTER) [Y] 7, 19 * entire document *; | [Y]US2002195490 (GEHLOT NARAYAN [US], et al) [Y] 9 * entire document *; | [Y]US2003200227 (RESSLER M KYLE [US]) [Y] 11 * entire document *; | [XY]US2004189493 (ESTUS JAY M [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-5, 14-16, 18 * entire document * [Y] 2, 6-13, 17, 19, 20; | [Y]US2007171077 (KAWARIZADEH BEHROUZ [US]) [Y] 20* entire document *; | [Y]US2007285361 (JOVANOVICH VLADIMIR [HR]) [Y] 8 * entire document *; | [Y]US2008252457 (FINDLAY W DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 2, 10-13, 17 * entire document *; | [Y]US2009193694 (CORDELL MICHAEL [GB], et al) [Y] 6 * entire document * |