EP3179525 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/24] | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
[2018/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd. 23-1 Kamikurechi 1-chome Fujiyoshida-shi, Yamanashi 403-0001 / JP | For all designated states Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 6-1-12, Tanashi-cho Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRASAWA, Koki c/o CITIZEN ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 1-23-1 Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi 403-0001 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Kazuki c/o CITIZEN ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 1-23-1 Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi 403-0001 / JP | 03 /
IINO, Takashi c/o CITIZEN ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 1-23-1 Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi 403-0001 / JP | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [2018/43] |
Former [2017/24] | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15830533.4 | 30.07.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015JP71607 | Priority number, date | JP20140159333 | 05.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014159333 | [2017/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016021476 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3179525 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3179525 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/12, H01L33/48, H01L23/00, // H01L33/62, H01L33/00, H01L33/56, H01L33/60 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
H01L33/62 (EP,US);
H01L23/12 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L33/486 (EP,US);
H01L33/502 (US);
H01L33/56 (EP,US);
H01L33/60 (EP,US);
H01L33/647 (US);
H01L2224/16245 (US);
H01L2224/95001 (US);
H01L2924/12041 (US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3511 (US);
H01L2924/37001 (US);
H01L2933/0033 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0041 (US);
H01L2933/005 (US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | H01L33/62, H01L23/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/24] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2018/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/24] |
Former [2017/24] | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2017 | Translation filed | 06.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 06.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 14.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2015 | AL | 24.10.2018 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | HR | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | MK | 24.10.2018 | MT | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | RS | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | SM | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | BG | 24.01.2019 | NO | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.07.2015 | |
AL | 24.10.2018 | ||
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
MT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.07.2015 | |
AL | 24.10.2018 | ||
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6599768 (CHEN TZER-PERNG [TW]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XI]DE10305021 (UNITED EPITAXY CO [TW]) [X] 1-10,12,13,17,18 * the whole document * [I] 11,14-16; | [A]US8324082 (LIU WEN-HUANG [TW], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 20 ** column 5, line 7 - column 5, line 33 * | International search | [A]JPH07106285 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH1140520 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-18 * , entire text; all drawings & US 5888883 A & US 6184109 B1 & US 6294439 B1 *; | [A]JP2011025347 (DISCO ABRASIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-18 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012204392 (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS, et al) [A] 1-18 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013157357 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-18* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |