EP3187590 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE COPOLYMER FROM SACCHARIDE RAW MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Institute of Technology 2-12-1, Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 3-18, Nakanoshima 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUI, Toshiaki c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-12-1 Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 02 /
ORITA, Izumi c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-12-1 Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2017/27] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 15830587.0 | 04.08.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015JP72107 | Priority number, date | JP20140158398 | 04.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014158398 | [2017/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016021604 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3187590 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3187590 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/62, C12N15/09, C12N9/02, C12N9/88 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
C12P7/625 (EP,US);
C12N15/09 (US);
C12N15/74 (EP,US);
C12N9/001 (EP);
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12P7/62 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYHYDROXYALKANOAT-COPOLYMER AUS SACCHARIDROHSTOFF | [2017/27] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE COPOLYMER FROM SACCHARIDE RAW MATERIAL | [2017/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COPOLYMÈRE DE POLYHYDROXYALCANOATE À PARTIR D'UNE MATIÈRE PREMIÈRE SACCHARIDIQUE | [2017/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2017 | Translation filed | 28.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 28.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2015 | AL | 26.02.2020 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | GB | 04.08.2020 | IE | 04.08.2020 | LU | 04.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
GB | 04.08.2020 | ||
IE | 04.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
GB | 04.08.2020 | ||
IE | 04.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
GB | 04.08.2020 | ||
IE | 04.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 04.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5942660 (GRUYS KENNETH JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP2295536 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * The query sequence SEQ ID NO:1 has 100.00 % identity (100.00 % similarity) over 1361 positions in a common overlap (range (q:s): 2-1362:2-1362) with subject EM_PAT:FV529690 (length: 1362) from the related patent family member WO2009145164-A/3 published on 2009-12-03.; page 4 - page 7 *; | [Y]WO2012099934 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 10 * The query sequence SEQ ID NO:2 has 85.48 % identity (85.48 % similarity) over 1233 positions in a common overlap (range (q:s): 49-1281:43-1272) with subject GSN:AZY12169 (length: 1284) from WO2012099934-A2 published on 2012-07-26.; page 10 - page 16 *; | [Y]WO2012135731 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 10 * The query sequence SEQ ID NO:2 has 85.48 % identity (85.48 % similarity) over 1233 positions in a common overlap (range (q:s): 49-1281:43-1272) with subject GSN:BAC11746 (length: 1284) from WO2012135731-A2 published on 2012-10-04. *; | [Y]EP2540835 (TOKYO INST TECH [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * see [009]-[017] and pages 5-9 The query sequence SEQ ID NO:3 has 100.00 % identity (100.00 % similarity) over 477 positions in a common overlap (range (q:s): 1-477:1-477) with subject EM_PAT:JC217824 (length: 477) from EP2540835-A1/2 published on 2013-01-02. *; | [E]EP2963119 (TOKYO INST TECH [JP], et al) [E] 1-12* the whole document *; | [Y] - C. F. BUDDE ET AL, "Production of Poly(3-Hydroxybutyrate-co-3-Hydroxyhexanoate) from Plant Oil by Engineered Ralstonia eutropha Strains", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20110311), vol. 77, no. 9, doi:10.1128/AEM.02429-10, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 2847 - 2854, XP055390336 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.02429-10 | [Y] - SHUNSUKE SATO ET AL, "Construction of a stable plasmid vector for industrial production of poly(3-hydroxybutyrate-co-3-hydroxyhexanoate) by a recombinant Cupriavidus necator H16 strain", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, NL, (20131201), vol. 116, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.jbiosc.2013.05.026, ISSN 1389-1723, pages 677 - 681, XP055242320 [Y] 1-12 * pages 677-679 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiosc.2013.05.026 | [YP] - SHUNSUKE SATO ET AL, "Regulation of 3-hydroxyhexanoate composition in PHBH synthesized by recombinant Cupriavidus necator H16 from plant oil by using butyrate as a co-substrate", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, NL, (20150901), vol. 120, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.jbiosc.2015.01.016, ISSN 1389-1723, pages 246 - 251, XP055242328 [YP] 1-12 * see abstrasct and pages 247-249 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiosc.2015.01.016 | [Y] - Y. KAWASHIMA ET AL, "Characterization and Functional Analyses of R-Specific Enoyl Coenzyme A Hydratases in Polyhydroxyalkanoate-Producing Ralstonia eutropha", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20120115), vol. 78, no. 2, doi:10.1128/AEM.06937-11, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 493 - 502, XP055217593 [Y] 1-12 * see abstract and pages 494-498 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.06937-11 | [Y] - SPOLJARIC IVNA VRANA ET AL, "In silicooptimization and low structured kinetic model of poly[(R)-3-hydroxybutyrate] synthesis byCupriavidus necatorDSM 545 by fed-batch cultivation on glycerol", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130831), vol. 168, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JBIOTEC.2013.08.019, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 625 - 635, XP028789035 [Y] 1-12 * see abstract and pages 626, 632-33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2013.08.019 | [Y] - LOPAR MARKAN ET AL, "Study of metabolic network ofCupriavidus necatorDSM 545 growing on glycerol by applying elementary flux modes and yield space analysis", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, BASINGSTOKE, GB, vol. 41, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S10295-014-1439-Y, ISSN 1367-5435, (20140409), pages 913 - 930, (20140409), XP035318216 [Y] 1-12 * see abstract and pages 915-16 and 918-921 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10295-014-1439-y | International search | [YA]JP2008029218 (KANEKA CORP) [Y] 2-3, 5-11 * , examples 1 to 5; paragraph [0029] (Family: none) * [A] 1, 4, 12; | [A]WO2011060048 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [YA] - FUKUI, TOSHIAKI et al., "Engineering of Ralstonia eutropha for Production of Poly(3- hydroxybutyrate-co-3-hydroxyhexanoate) from Fructose and Solid-State Properties of the Copolymer", Biomacromolecules, (20020000), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1021/BM02555084, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 618 - 624, XP 002538853 [Y] 2-3, 5-11 * , particularly, Abstract, Fig.1 * [A] 1, 4, 12 | [YA] - TOSHIAKI FUKUI, "Microbial synthesis of optically active polyesters and 3- hydroxyalkanoic acids", fine chemicals, (20090000), vol. 38, no. 5, pages 32 - 42, XP 008166919 [Y] 2-3, 5-11 * , particularly, page 38, lines 2 to 19 * [A] 1, 4, 12 | [A] - ERB, TOBIAS J et al., "Carboxylation mechanism and stereochemistry of crotonyl-CoA carboxylase/reductase, a carboxylating enoyl-thioester reductase", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20090000), vol. 106, no. 22, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8871 - 8876, XP055398095 [A] 1-12 * , particularly, Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0903939106 | [A] - LINSTER, CAROLE L. et al., "Ethylmalonyl-CoA Decarboxylase, a New Enzyme Involved in Metabolite Proofreading", Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20110000), vol. 286, no. 50, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 42992 - 43003, XP055398097 [A] 1-12 * , particularly, Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M111.281527 | [PX] - INSOMPHUN, CHAYATIP et al., "Improved artificial pathway for biosynthesis of poly(3- hydroxybutyrate-co-3-hydroxyhexanoate) with high C6-monomer composition from fructose in Ralstonia eutropha", Metabolic Engineering, (20141000), vol. 27, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 38 - 45, XP055301725 [PX] 1-12 * , entire text * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2014.10.006 |