EP3196342 - MODIFIED CROSS-SECTION HOLLOW FIBER, AND FIBER ASSEMBLY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUVIS Co., Ltd. POBA Gangnam Tower 12F 343 Hakdong-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-820 / KR | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Oh-hyuk 607-203 187 Noeundong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34083 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Yun-jeong 104-104 177 Saessak-ro Busanjin-gu Busan 47109 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Ji-yoon 303-301 Purgio Apt. 251 Jukdong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34127 / KR | 04 /
OH, Seung-jin 303-301 Purgio Apt. 251 Jukdong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34127 / KR | 05 /
HO, Yo-seung 410-1403 35 Baeul 1-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34022 / KR | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Lantos, Mihaly Danubia Patent & Law Office LLC Bajcsy-Zsilinszky út 16 1051 Budapest / HU | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 15830750.4 | 06.08.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015KR08263 | Priority number, date | KR20140100788 | 06.08.2014 Original published format: KR 20140100788 | KR20140116331 | 02.09.2014 Original published format: KR 20140116331 | KR20140148469 | 29.10.2014 Original published format: KR 20140148469 | KR20150047576 | 03.04.2015 Original published format: KR 20150047576 | KR20150101874 | 17.07.2015 Original published format: KR 20150101874 | [2017/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016021968 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3196342 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3196342 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/253, D01D5/24, D04H1/56, D04H1/4291, D04H1/559, A61F13/47, D01F6/06, A61F13/49, A61F13/53 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
D01D5/24 (EP,US);
D04H1/559 (US);
A61F13/47 (US);
A61F13/49 (US);
A61F13/53 (US);
D01D5/253 (EP,US);
D01F6/06 (US);
D04H1/4291 (EP,US);
D04H1/56 (EP,US);
D10B2509/026 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/30] | D01D5/253, D01D5/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOHLFASER MIT MODIFIZIERTEM QUERSCHNITT UND FASERANORDNUNG DAMIT | [2017/30] | English: | MODIFIED CROSS-SECTION HOLLOW FIBER, AND FIBER ASSEMBLY USING SAME | [2017/30] | French: | FIBRE CREUSE À SECTION TRANSVERSALE MODIFIÉE, ET ENSEMBLE DE FIBRES L'UTILISANT | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2017 | Translation filed | 27.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 27.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2015 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | TR | 09.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.08.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 06.08.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 06.08.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 06.08.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 09.09.2020 | |
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61132620 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1-19* figure 3; claim 1 *; | [X]JPH08246225 (KURARAY CO) [X] 1,6,7,12,19 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0011] - [0020] - [0022] , [0025] , [0042] , [0043]; figure 2 *; | [XI]US2006012072 (HAGEWOOD JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 1,8,12,19 * paragraphs [0002] , [0043] , [0045] , [0051] , [0055] , [0057] , [0064] , [0076] , [0131] , [0142] * [I] 2-7,9-11,13-18; | [XI]US2009246492 (BISHOP NYLE [US], et al) [X] 1,8,12,19 * paragraphs [0002] , [0045] * [I] 2-7,9-11,13-18 | International search | [XY]US4407889 (GINTIS DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-8, 11-19 * See abstract; column 1, line 14-column 2, line 57; column 3, lines 8-17; and figures 1, 2. * [Y] 9, 10; | [A]KR920012541 (TONG YANG NYLON CO., LTD. et al.) [A] 1-19* See claims 1, 2; and figures 1, 2, 4. *; | [A]JP2011200295 (TEIJIN FIBERS LTD) [A] 1-19 * See abstract; claims 1-9; and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]KR20120057470 (KOREA IND TECH INST [KR]) [Y] 9 * See abstract; claim 7; and paragraphs [0023], [0031], *; | [Y]KR101349262B (IKSUNG CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 10 * See abstract; and paragraphs [0026], [0029], [0039]-[0045]. * |