06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
02.08.2024 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.06.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
24.06.2024 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.03.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
23.03.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
30.06.2023 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
07.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] |
16.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
20.09.2022 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
15.05.2022 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
08.04.2022 |
Opposition filed |
published on 11.05.2022 [2022/19] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
28.05.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
21.05.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.01.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
17.11.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.07.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.03.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.08.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
21.08.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.07.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.02.2019 |
First examination report |
|
11.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
23.02.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
12.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
22.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
01.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
07.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|