EP3233293 - DEVICE FOR EMITTING A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marino, Daniele Via Molena 9 31095 Conegliano / IT | [2021/26] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Marino, Daniele Via Molena 9 31095 Conegliano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/26] | Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/43] | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15830831.2 | 21.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015IB02406 | Priority number, date | IT2014PN00067 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: IT PN20140067 | [2017/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016097852 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3233293 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3233293 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3233293 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/16, B01F5/04, B05B7/24, B08B3/02, B25F3/00, F02B63/06 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
B08B3/026 (EP,US);
A01C15/04 (US);
A01G25/145 (US);
A01M21/043 (EP,US);
A01M7/0046 (EP,US);
B01F23/451 (US);
B01F25/31242 (EP,US);
B01F25/316 (EP,US);
B05B1/1654 (EP,US);
B05B1/3006 (US);
B05B15/65 (EP,US);
B05B15/652 (EP,US);
B05B15/654 (EP,US);
B05B7/2443 (EP,US);
B05B7/247 (EP,US);
B05B7/2478 (EP,US);
B08B3/028 (US);
B25F3/00 (EP,US);
F04B1/14 (EP,US);
F04B1/141 (EP,US);
F04B1/146 (US);
F04B1/16 (US);
F04B17/06 (EP,US);
F04B19/22 (US);
F04B23/02 (US);
F04B53/10 (US);
F04B53/16 (US);
B01F2101/04 (US);
B01F2101/32 (US);
B01F2101/4505 (US);
B01F23/483 (US);
B08B2203/0217 (EP,US);
B08B2203/0223 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSGABE EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2017/43] | English: | DEVICE FOR EMITTING A LIQUID | [2017/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉMISSION D'UN LIQUIDE | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 07.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 07.03.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.03.2022
04.04.2022
ADMISSIBLE Andreas Stihl AG & Co. KG Badstrasse 115 71336 Waiblingen / DE Opponent's representative Karzel, Philipp, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/19] | 16.05.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.09.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.02.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2015 | AL | 30.06.2021 | AT | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | ES | 30.06.2021 | FI | 30.06.2021 | HR | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MK | 30.06.2021 | MT | 30.06.2021 | NL | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | RS | 30.06.2021 | SE | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | SM | 30.06.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | NO | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | IE | 21.12.2021 | LU | 21.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
MK | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 21.12.2021 | ||
LU | 21.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 21.12.2021 | ||
LU | 21.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 21.12.2021 | ||
LU | 21.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 21.12.2021 | ||
LU | 21.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 21.12.2021 | ||
LU | 21.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 21.12.2021 | ||
LU | 21.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 21.12.2021 | ||
LU | 21.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 21.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 30.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2309283 (MENET JEAN [FR]); | [A]FR2325469 (KRESS ELEKTRIK GMBH & CO [DE]); | [XY]US5421520 (SIMONETTE DALLAS W [US], et al); | [XY]CA2165241 (LILKE HARVEY [CA]); | [A]DE20016091U (CEKA ELEKTROWERKZEUGE AG & CO [CH]); | [A]EP1852190 (SUTTNER GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2009065607 (GARDNER MICHAEL R [US], et al) | Examination | EP0468081 | DE20016091U | CN1974282 | CN200999036Y | US2008257988 | US2009045271 | Opposition | FR2309283 | FR2325469 | US5071069 | EP0468081 | US5421520 | EP0666118 | CA2165241 | DE20016091U | EP1174195 | WO2007059305 | EP1852190 | CN200999036Y | WO2008064759 | US2008257988 | US2009045271 | US2009065607 | WO2011039117 | WO2013060386 |