25.09.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
23.06.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.01.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.01.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2018 |
First examination report |
|
02.03.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
02.03.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
03.02.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
29.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
29.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
04.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
19.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|