Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017253933 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201715597789 | 17.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170094165 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018508183 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107109491 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2968359 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015369624 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3237639 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017010788 | 26.12.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1243141 | 06.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017006864 | 28.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2710735 | 10.01.2020 | C2 | RU2017125054 | 23.10.2019 | A3 | RU2017125054 | 24.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201704707P | 28.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | WO2015US67427 | 22.12.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016106340 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2016 | A3 | WO2016106340 | 30.06.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201562200340 | 03.08.2015 | US201462096355 | 23.12.2014 |