EP3180632 - A METHOD OF SETTING-UP A RANGE-BASED TRACKING SYSTEM UTILISING A TRACKING COORDINATE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific & Industrial Research Organisation ( C.S.I.R.O. ) Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDLEY, Mark 8 Wilona Avenue Greenwich, NSW 2065 / AU | 02 /
POPESCU, Dan 205/41 Chandler Street Belconnen, ACT 2617 / AU | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Black, Diego Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Bishton, Amy Virginia Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15831589.5 | 12.08.2015 | [2017/25] | WO2015AU00484 | Priority number, date | AU20140903191 | 15.08.2014 Original published format: AU 2014903191 | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016023069 | Date: | 18.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3180632 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/00, // G01S5/02 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
G01S5/0289 (EP,US);
G01B21/045 (US);
G01S5/0294 (US);
G01S2205/007 (US);
G01S5/0226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/25] | G01S5/00, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EINRICHTUNG EINES BEREICHSBASIERTEN VERFOLGUNGSSYSTEMS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES VERFOLGUNGSKOORDINATENSYSTEMS | [2017/25] | English: | A METHOD OF SETTING-UP A RANGE-BASED TRACKING SYSTEM UTILISING A TRACKING COORDINATE SYSTEM | [2017/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTABLISSEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE POURSUITE BASÉ SUR UNE PLAGE UTILISANT UN SYSTÈME DE COORDONNÉES DE POURSUITE | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 08.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2023 | 09.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/43] | 19.06.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/43] | 30.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005228613 (FULLERTON LARRY W [US], et al) [Y] 10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0137] *; | [XYI]US2007217379 (FUJIWARA RYOSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0135] * * claims 1, 10, 12 * * figures 1A, 4 * [Y] 8,10-12 [I] 6,7,9,13; | [IY]WO2008116168 (JADI INC [US], et al) [I] 1-7,9,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0111] * * claims 1, 4, 5 * [Y] 8,10-12; | [YA]US2010271263 (MOSHFEGHI MEHRAN [US]) [Y] 8 * abstract * * figures 8, 11, 12 * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0144] * [A] 1-7,9,13-15; | [Y] - PORTA J M ET AL, "On the Trilaterable Six-Degree-of-Freedom Parallel and Serial Manipulators", ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2005 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BARCELONA, SPAIN 18-22 APRIL 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050418), doi:10.1109/ROBOT.2005.1570241, ISBN 978-0-7803-8914-4, pages 960 - 967, XP010872057 [Y] 11,12 * chapters I.-III. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.2005.1570241 | [Y] - PHILLIP A REGALIA ET AL, "On distance reconstruction for sensor network localization", ACOUSTICS SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100314), ISBN 978-1-4244-4295-9, pages 2866 - 2869, XP031698094 [Y] 11,12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2007150176 (ZHANG YING [US], et al) [A] 1-13, 16-18 (in part) and 19 * Whole document *; | [X]US2011140969 (ERGEN MUSTAFA [US], et al) [X] 1-13, 16-18 (in part) and 19 * Abstract; paragraphs [0025]-[0039], [0044]-[0049] and [0054]-[0064]; FIGs. 2-6 *; | [A]US2011188389 (HEDLEY MARK [AU], et al) [A] 1-13, 16-18 (in part) and 19* Whole document *; | [X]CN102231911B (UNIV NANJING) [X] 1-13, 16-18 (in part) and 19 * Abstract; paragraphs [0002], [0005]-[0030] (V is the feature matrix in paragraph [0029]), [0061]-[0111] *; | [X] - POPESCU, D. C. et al., "A manifold flattening approach for anchorless localization", Wireless networks, (20120000), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1007/s11276-011-0402-3, pages 319 - 333, XP035024851 [X] 1-13, 16-18 (in part) and 19 * . abstract; Sections 1 - 3 and 6-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11276-011-0402-3 |