EP3180922 - TECHNIQUES AND APPARATUS FOR EDITING VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/34] |
Former [2017/25] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Glen J. 16140 NW Somerset Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | 02 /
RAFFA, Giuseppe 4185 NW 176th Avenue Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/34] |
Former [2017/25] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15831646.3 | 25.06.2015 | [2017/25] | WO2015US37618 | Priority number, date | US201414459229 | 13.08.2014 Original published format: US201414459229 | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016025086 | Date: | 18.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3180922 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3180922 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/031, G11B27/34, H04N21/80, H04N21/854 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
G11B27/031 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | H04N21/80, H04N21/854, G11B27/031, G11B27/28 | ||
Former IPC [2017/25] | H04N21/80, H04N21/854 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINES VIDEOS | [2017/25] | English: | TECHNIQUES AND APPARATUS FOR EDITING VIDEO | [2017/25] | French: | TECHNIQUES ET APPAREIL POUR MONTAGE VIDÉO | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 18.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.03.2023 | 22.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23179570.9 / EP4236332 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003033602 (GIBBS SIMON [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0017] - [0036]; figures 1,2,4,5A,5B *; | [I]US2007182861 (LUO JIEBO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1954041 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2013330054 (LOKSHIN DAVID J [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2014072284 (AVRAHAMI DANIEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2014116689 (FLEYE INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2005033760 (FULLER CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 1-8, 10-11, 14-20 , 23-25 * See paragraphs [0047], [0068]; claims 3, 27-29; and figure 6. *; | [A]WO2009094611 (SONY ONLINE ENTERTAINMENT LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0060]-[0062], [0093]-[0100]; and figures 3, 11. *; | [YA]US2012263439 (LASSMAN DAVID KING [US], et al) [Y] 1-8, 10-11, 14-20 , 23-25 * See paragraphs [0005], [0033], [0036], [0038], [0040], [0043]; claim 10; and figures 2-3. * [A] 9, 12-13, 21-22; | [A]US2012308209 (ZALETEL MICHAEL EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0010]-[0015], [0080]-[0091]; and figure 5. *; | [A]US2013125000 (FLEISCHHAUER MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-25* See paragraphs [0074]-[0088] claims 1-5; and figure 1. * | by applicant | US2003033602 |