EP3276663 - ARRAY SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR FABRICATION THEREOF AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xiaodi No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Gang No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 15832676.9 | 18.09.2015 | [2018/05] | WO2015CN89997 | Priority number, date | CN201510132293 | 25.03.2015 Original published format: CN201510132293 | [2018/05] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016150122 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3276663 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, H01L21/77 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
H01L27/1255 (EP,US);
H01L27/1288 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Title | German: | ARRAYSUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/05] | English: | ARRAY SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR FABRICATION THEREOF AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2018/05] | French: | SUBSTRAT MATRICIEL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2016 | Translation filed | 19.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2016 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 19.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002105603 (YOO HONG SUK [KR], et al) [Y] 3,9-12 * figures 6,7A-D *; | [XI]US2003116764 (FUJIKAWA TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,13,14,16 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040] *[I] 5,6,15; | [Y]KR20070115235 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3,9-12 * figures 5-9 *; | [XYI]US2009179831 (YAMASHITA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,13,14,16 * figure 8B * * paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0215] * [Y] 3,9-12 [I] 5,6,15; | [A]US2013334502 (LIU YAWEI [CN]) [A] 3,9-12 * figure 6 *; | [XI]EP2743983 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-4,7-14,16 * the whole document * [I] 5,6,15; | [XYI]CN104064688 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,16 * figures 3-10 * [Y] 3,9-12 [I] 5,6,13-15; | [E]US2016247837 (SHI LONGQIANG [CN], et al) [E] 1,2,4,7,8,16 * figures 3-10 * | International search | [A]US2004126917 (YOO SOON-SUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2009153056 (CHEN PO-LIN [TW], et al) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102768992 (GUANGZHOU NEW VISION OPTOELECTRONIC CO LTD) [A] 1-16* , the whole document *; | [XY]CN102945828 (GUANGZHOU NEW VISION OPTOELECTRONIC CO LTD) [X] 1-2, 4-8, 13-16 * , description, paragraphs 0056-0066, and figures 1-6, description, paragraphs 0056-0066, and figures 1-6 * [Y] 3, 9-12; | [Y]CN103928470 (SHANGHAI TIANMA MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD, et al) [Y] 3, 9-12 * , description, paragraphs 0031-0032, and figure 3 *; | [PX]CN104701328 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1-16 * , description, paragraphs 0050-0094, and figures 8-9 * |