EP3398386 - CELLULAR MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK HAVING NETWORK CELLS INTERCOMMUNICATING VIA RADIO SIGNALS, PARTICULARLY FOR NETWORK CELLS COORDINATION FOR INTERFERENCE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via Gaetano Negri, 1 20123 Milano / IT | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARETTI, Marco Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli 274 10148 Torino / IT | 02 /
DELL'AERA, Gian, Michele Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli 274 10148 Torino / IT | 03 /
FODRINI, Maurizio Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli 274 10148 Torino / IT | 04 /
MELIS, Bruno Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli 274 10148 Torino / IT | 05 /
SABELLA, Dario Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli 274 10148 Torino / IT | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Maccalli, Marco, et al Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini, 40 20124 Milano / IT | [2018/45] | Application number, filing date | 15832687.6 | 28.12.2015 | [2018/45] | WO2015EP81287 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017114548 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3398386 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3398386 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04W72/27, H04W72/541 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H04B7/2615 (EP,US);
H04L5/0032 (US);
H04L5/0023 (US);
H04L5/1438 (US);
H04W40/06 (US);
H04W72/27 (EP,US);
H04W72/541 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | H04W72/04, H04W72/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILFUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ MIT ÜBER FUNKSIGNALE MITEINANDER KOMMUNIZIERENDEN NETZZELLEN, INSBESONDERE ZUR NETZZELLENKOORDINATION FÜR INTERFERENZUNTERDRÜCKUNG | [2018/45] | English: | CELLULAR MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK HAVING NETWORK CELLS INTERCOMMUNICATING VIA RADIO SIGNALS, PARTICULARLY FOR NETWORK CELLS COORDINATION FOR INTERFERENCE CONTROL | [2018/45] | French: | RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE CELLULAIRE COMPRENANT DES CELLULES DE RÉSEAU COMMUNIQUANT ENTRE ELLES VIA DES SIGNAUX RADIOS, EN PARTICULIER POUR DES CELLULES DE RÉSEAU DE COORDINATION POUR LA SURVEILLANCE DES BROUILLAGES | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 20.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2013153128 (TELEFONICA SA [ES]) | Examination | US2014192759 | US2015372797 | by applicant | WO2010093644 | WO2013153128 | WO2014109683 |