EP3233099 - PHAGE THERAPY FOR TARGETING ENTEROCOCCI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd. Hi-Tech Park Edmond J. Safra Campus Givat Ram P.O.B 39135 91390 Jerusalem / IL | For all designated states Hadasit Medical Research Services And Development Ltd. P.o.b. 12000 91120 Jerusalem / IL | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAZAN, Nissan Ronen 2/2 Tlalim St. 99875 Tzur-Hadassah / IL | 02 /
BEYTH, Nurit 26/11 Moshe Kol St. 9371532 Jerusalem / IL | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15832749.4 | 17.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015IL51227 | Priority number, date | US201462092932P | 17.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462092932 P | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016098116 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3233099 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, C12N7/00 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
A61K35/76 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/0034 (US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10121 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10132 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10171 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | PHAGENTHERAPIE GEGEN ENTEROKOKKEN | [2017/43] | English: | PHAGE THERAPY FOR TARGETING ENTEROCOCCI | [2017/43] | French: | PHAGOTHÉRAPIE POUR CIBLER DES ENTÉROCOQUES | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 26.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 31.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2014160710 (UNIV TEMPLE [US]; CRAIG J VENTER INST INC [US]) [Y] 1-17 * page 2 - page 7; claims 7-27 * * page 26 - page 29 *; | [Y]WO2010090542 (TECHNOPHAGE INVESTIGACAO E DES [PT]; TECNIFAR IND TECNICA FARMACEUT [P) [Y] 1-17 * page 2 - page 3; examples 1,2; claims 1-3, 31-39 *; | [Y]WO2010036132 (WEBER-DABROWSKA BEATA [PL]; INST IMMUNOLOGII I TERAPII DOS [PL]; GORSK) [Y] 1-17 * examples 1-17 *; | [Y]WO2010068940 (NOVALAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; BAKAN DOUGLAS A [US]; KELAITA DEREK) [Y] 16,17 * claims 1-36 *; | [Y] - TIMOTHY K LU ET AL, "The next generation of bacteriophage therapy", CURRENT OPINION IN MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 14, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.MIB.2011.07.028, ISSN 1369-5274, (20110823), pages 524 - 531, (20110730), XP028312588 [Y] 1-17 * page 526 - page 529 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mib.2011.07.028 | [Y] - MARKOISHVILI K ET AL, "A novel sustained-release matrix based on biodegradable poly(ester amide)s and impregnated with bacteriophages and an antibiotic shows promise in management of infected venous stasis ulcers and other poorly healing wounds", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, UK, vol. 41, no. 7, doi:10.1046/J.1365-4362.2002.01451.X, ISSN 0011-9059, (200207), pages 453 - 458, (20020716), XP002753546 [Y] 16,17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-4362.2002.01451.x | [XP] - LERON KHALIFA ET AL, "Targeting Enterococcus faecalis Biofilms with Phage Therapy", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20150206), vol. 81, no. 8, doi:10.1128/AEM.00096-15, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 2696 - 2705, XP055262583 [XP] 3,5-8,12-15 * page 2699 - page 2703 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.00096-15 | Examination | - Leron Khalifa ET AL, "Complete Genome Sequence of Enterococcus Bacteriophage EFLK1", Genome Announcements, (20151119), vol. 3, no. 6, doi:10.1128/genomeA.01308-15, pages e01308 - 15, XP055486230 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/genomeA.01308-15 | by applicant | US4666828 | US4683202 | US4801531 | US5192659 | US5272057 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, (1994), vol. I-III | - WATSON ET AL., Recombinant DNA, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN BOOKS | - Genome Analysis: A Laboratory Manual Series, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1998), vol. 1-4 | - Cell Biology: A Laboratory Handbook, (1994), vol. I-III | - Current Protocols in Immunology, (1994), vol. I-III | - "Bacteriophage Methods and Protocols", Isolation, Characterization, and Interactions, SPRINGER, (2009), vol. 1 | - "Bacteriophage Methods and Protocols", CLOKIE; KROPINSKI, molecular and applied aspects, SPRINGER, (2009), vol. 2 |