EP3140643 - XRF ANALYZER COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moxtek, Inc. 452 West 1260 North Orem, UT 84057 / US | [2017/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Vincent Floyd 10564 Sugarloaf Drive Cedar Hills, Utah 84062 / US | 02 /
PAAS, Daniel N. 2025 E. 280 S. Spanish Fork, Utah 84660 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Brad 761 Southampton Court Farmington, Utah 84025 / US | 04 /
HANSEN, Bill 889 S.Anna Ekins Lane Genota UT 84655 / US | [2017/37] |
Former [2017/11] | 01 /
JONES, Vincent Floyd 10564 Sugarloaf Drive Cedar Hills, Utah 84062 / US | ||
02 /
PAAS, Daniel N. 2025 E. 280 S. Spanish Fork, Utah 84660 / US | |||
03 /
HARRIS, Brad 761 Southampton Court Farmington, Utah 84025 / US | |||
04 /
HANSEN, Bill 1134 Mammoth Drive Manteca, California 95337 / US | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15833271.8 | 10.08.2015 | [2017/11] | WO2015US44472 | Priority number, date | US201462039767P | 20.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462039767 P | US201514821350 | 07.08.2015 Original published format: US201514821350 | [2017/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016028535 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3140643 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/223, G08C17/02 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
G01N23/223 (EP,US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
G01N2223/301 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/11] | G01N23/223 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Title | German: | XRF-ANALYSATOR-KOMMUNIKATION | [2017/11] | English: | XRF ANALYZER COMMUNICATION | [2017/11] | French: | COMMUNICATION D'ANALYSEUR XRF | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 06.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/52] | 20.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US6266390 (SOMMER JR EDWARD J [US], et al) [I] 1,3-5,7,8 * column 8, lines 43-63 * * column 10, lines 43-45 * * column 23, line 55 - column 24, line 11 * * figure 1 * [A] 6,9-15; | [A]US2003128804 (POTEET WADE M [US], et al) [A] 13,14* paragraphs [0049] - [0059]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP1521160 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 7,12 * paragraphs [0063] , [ 0064] *; | [A]US7233645 (FEDA FRANCIS MICHAEL [US]) [A] 8,13,14 * column 5, lines 54-60 * * column 7, line 33 - column 9, line 13 * * column 32, lines 56-63 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2008192889 (ROHDE MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0020] - [0033] - [ 0053] - [0055]; figures 1-5, 8 *; | [XI]WO2009012352 (BRUKER BIOSCIENCES CORP [US], et al) [X] 9 * paragraphs [0018] - [0045]; figures 1-6 * [I] 1-8,10-15; | [XI]US2010080351 (HESSION-KUNZ ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0035] - [0041] - [ 0048] - [0056] - [ 0071] - [0076]; figures 1, 3-6, 11, 12 * [I] 2,4-15; | [XI]US2010272232 (PESCE JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0016] - [0020] - [ 0037]; figure 1 * [I] 2,4-15; | [XI]US2013321793 (HAMILTON MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] - [ 0044]; figures 1, 2A, 2B * [I] 2,4-15 | International search | [XY]US2013321793 (HAMILTON MARK A [US], et al) [X] 16-20 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0044] and figures 1-4B. * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US2008192889 (ROHDE MARTIN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraph [0053] and figures 2-8. *; | [A]US2014201033 (CRAIN GARY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See figures 1-4B. *; | [A]US2012236989 (HARDMAN PETER JOHN [US]) [A] 1-20 * See figures 1-7. *; | [A]US2010226476 (PESCE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See figures 1-15. * |