EP3197080 - APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING BROADCAST SIGNAL, APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING BROADCAST SIGNAL, METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING BROADCAST SIGNAL, AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING BROADCAST SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul, 07336 / KR | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAEK, Jongseob IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 02 /
BACK, Seoyoung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 03 /
KO, Woosuk IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 04 /
HONG, Sungryong IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66 rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15833876.4 | 01.06.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015KR05458 | Priority number, date | US201462039921P | 21.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462039921 P | US201462051966P | 18.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462051966 P | [2017/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016027965 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3197080 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H03M13/11, H03M13/27, H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04L27/26, H04N21/235, H04N21/236, H04B7/0413 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
H04L1/0042 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,KR,US);
H03M13/1102 (US);
H03M13/2792 (KR,US);
H04B7/0413 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/046 (US);
H04B7/0606 (US);
H04L1/0041 (US);
H04L1/0048 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/0083 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L27/2649 (KR);
H04L65/611 (US);
H04H60/07 (KR);
H04L2001/0093 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/26] | H04L1/00, H03M13/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN EINES RUNDFUNKSIGNALS, VORRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANGEN EINES RUNDFUNKSIGNALS, VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN EINES RUNDFUNKSIGNALS UND VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANGEN EINES RUNDFUNKSIGNALS | [2017/26] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING BROADCAST SIGNAL, APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING BROADCAST SIGNAL, METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING BROADCAST SIGNAL, AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING BROADCAST SIGNAL | [2017/26] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION, APPAREIL DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION, PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2017 | Translation filed | 07.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 07.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009072813 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [Y] 3,4,7,8 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 10 * * page 4, paragraph 56 - page 5, paragraph 59 ** figures 1,16-18,29 *; | [XY]WO2013069272 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,7,8; | [XPY]EP2779560 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 12 - column 8, paragraph 39 * * column 15, paragraph 104 - column 21, paragraph 146 * * figures 1,2,18-24 * [Y] 3,4,7,8; | [E]EP3157253 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1-8 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph 53 - paragraph 62 * * page 10, paragraph 103 - page 11, paragraph 120 * * page 12, paragraph 135 - page 13, paragraph 141 * * page 13, paragraph 155 - page 14, paragraph 162 * * page 36, paragraph 304 - page 39, paragraph 359 * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1,5,7,9,40-45 * | International search | [A]US2010251078 (YOKOKAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0046] and figures 1-4. *; | [X]KR101079106B (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [X] 1-4 * See paragraphs [00901-[01101, [0182] and figure 11. *; | [A]EP2472751 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY [KR]) [A] 1-4* See paragraphs [0013]-[0047] and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US2013117624 (NICOLAS FREDERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * See paragraphs [0030] - [0038] and figures 4-6. *; | [A]KR20130121881 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-4 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0054] and figures 1-3. * |