EP3183184 - A MULTI-DOSE MEDICATION KIT FOR TREATING ANAPHYLAXIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mylan Inc. 781 Chestnut Ridge Road Morgantown, WV 26505 / US | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GULFO, Adele 781 Chestnut Ridge Road Morgantown, WV 26505 / US | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Portch, Daniel Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15834190.9 | 19.08.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015US45958 | Priority number, date | US201414464866 | 21.08.2014 Original published format: US201414464866 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016028932 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183184 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D69/00, A61K9/00, A61K31/137 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0078 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/26] | B65D69/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Title | German: | KIT MIT MULTIDOSISARZNEI ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANAPHYLAXIE | [2017/26] | English: | A MULTI-DOSE MEDICATION KIT FOR TREATING ANAPHYLAXIS | [2017/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MÉDICATION À DOSES MULTIPLES POUR TRAITER L'ANAPHYLAXIE | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 03.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004076588 (BATYCKY RICHARD P [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* claim - *; | [XY]WO2007143676 (VERUS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9-12,14,15 * claim - * * paragraphs [0084] - [0090] * * paragraph [0003] * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [XY]US2007293580 (Hill) [X] 1-3, 7-9, 12, 13 * abstract, para [0002], [0006], [0010], [0011], [0016], [0025], [0027], [0048], [0076], [0084], [0140]. * [Y] 4-6, 10, 11, 14-23; | [Y]US2013317477 (Edwards et al.) [Y] 4-6, 11 * (abstract; Fig 1-5, para [0002], [0003], [0044], [0219], [0222] *; | [Y]US2012008811 (Edwards et al.) [Y] 10 * para [0003], [0005], [0046], [0123] *; | [Y]US2004076588 (Batycky et al.) [Y] 14 * para [0095], [0100], [0102] *; | [Y]US2008059133 (Edwards et al.) [Y] 15-23 * para [0003], [0005], [0041], [0055], [0183], [0184] *; | [Y]US2009054360 (Chiang et al.) [Y] 17-23 * para [0006], [0007], [0018] * |