EP3186773 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REAL ESTATE VALUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Municipal Property Assessment Corporation 1340 Pickering Parkway Pickering, Ontario L1V 0C4 / CA | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAGDEV, Sujit Pal Singh 1340 Pickering Parkway Pickering, Ontario L1V 0C4 / CA | 02 /
DEVADASON, Christopher Paul 1340 Pickering Parkway Pickering, Ontario L1V 0C4 / CA | 03 /
SAYANY, Salman Ashiqali 1340 PickeringParkway Pickering, Ontario L1V 0C4 / CA | 04 /
PALLANIK, Kyle Robert Joseph 1340 Pickering Parkway Pickering, Ontario L1V 0C4 / CA | 05 /
ELLENS, James Kenneth 1340 Pickering Parkway Pickering, Ontario L1V 0C4 / CA | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2017/27] | Application number, filing date | 15836079.2 | 26.08.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015CA50818 | Priority number, date | US201462041985P | 26.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462041985 P | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016029313 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3186773 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 03.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/16, G06Q40/00 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0278 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0205 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q50/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR IMMOBILIENBEWERTUNG | [2017/27] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REAL ESTATE VALUATION | [2017/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR UNE ÉVALUATION DE BIENS IMMOBILIERS | [2017/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 20.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 20.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/42] | 26.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.06.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/42] | Divisional application(s) | EP21189067.8 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US8140421 (HUMPHRIES STANLEY B [US], et al) [X] 1,9,15 * column 3, lines 21-30 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 16 * * column 10, line 17 - column 11, line 44 * * column 12, lines 28-62 * * column 13, lines 40-47 *[I] 2-8,10-14 | International search | [A]CA2337760 (COSTAR GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * whole document *; | [X]US2002087389 (SKLARZ MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1, 9-11, 15 * figures 2, 3, 7; ahfract *; | [X]US2010161498 (WALKER ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1, 9-11, 15 * figure 1; paragraph 0034 *; | [A]CA2892026 (ZIPREALTY LLC [US]) [A] 1-20* whole document * | by applicant | US8140421 |