EP3193629 - ANTI-DIARRHEA FORMULATION WHICH AVOIDS ANTIMICROBIAL RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anatara Lifesciences Limited 433 Logan Road Stones Corner Brisbane, QLD 4120 / AU | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYNOTT, Tracey L. 32 Kingsholme Street Tenerife QLD 4005 / AU | 02 /
WALSH, John 5 Stirgess Ave, Curl Curl Sydney, New South Wales 2096 / AU | [2017/48] |
Former [2017/30] | 01 /
MYNOTT, Tracey L. 433 Logan Road Stones Corner Brisbane, QLD 4120 / AU | ||
02 /
WALSH, John 5 Stirgess Ave, Curl Curl Sydney, New South Wales 2096 / AU | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/04] |
Former [2017/30] | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15836374.7 | 24.08.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015US46509 | Priority number, date | US201462041175P | 25.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462041175 P | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016032944 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193629 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3193629 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A23K50/30, A23K20/189, A61K38/48, A23K10/00, // A61P1/12 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
A61K38/4873 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,KR,US);
A23K20/189 (EP,KR,US);
A23K50/30 (EP,KR,US);
A23K50/60 (EP,KR,US);
A23K50/80 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/183 (US);
A61K47/24 (US);
A61K9/0056 (US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12Y304/22032 (EP,US);
C12Y304/22033 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/30] | A23K10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNG GEGEN DURCHFALL MIT VERHINDERUNG VON ANTIMIKROBIELLER RESISTENZ | [2017/30] | English: | ANTI-DIARRHEA FORMULATION WHICH AVOIDS ANTIMICROBIAL RESISTANCE | [2017/30] | French: | FORMULATION ANTI-DIARRHÉIQUE ÉVITANT LA RÉSISTANCE AUX ANTIMICROBIENS | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 22.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2023 | CZ | 25.01.2023 | EE | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | PL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SE | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SK | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | IE | 24.08.2023 | LU | 24.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
IE | 24.08.2023 | ||
LU | 24.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
LU | 24.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 25.01.2023 | |
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 25.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8801506 (YING THOMAS KO SAI [AU]) [X] 1,5,6,10-12 * page 4, lines 17-30 * * page 5, lines 19-20 * * examples 1,5 *; | [X]US5484609 (KO THOMAS SAI YING [AU]) [X] 1,5,6,10-12 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 7 ** examples 1,4 *; | [XI]CN1548154 (WEI AO SICHUAN BIOTECHNOLOGY C [CN]) [X] 1-5,10-12 * the whole document * [I] 13-15; | [XI]WO2008049437 (BIOFIBER DAMINO AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10-12 * page 1, line 8 * * page 2, lines 8-30 * * page 4, lines 8-9,17-20 * * page 7, lines 4-20 * * page 20, lines 22-33 * * page 23, lines 1-18 * * page 24, line 8 * [I] 8 | International search | [A]US6080403 (SHIELDS JR RICHARD G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [XY]US2006052438 (HO CHI-TANG [US], et al) [X] 9-12 * entire document * [Y] 4-8, 15; | [A]WO2009009879 (AQUIENCE INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [XY] - CHANDLER et al., "Bromelain protects piglets from diarrhea caused by oral challenge with K88 positive enterotoxigenic Escherichia coli", Gut, (19980801), vol. 43, pages 196 - 202, XP 002464839 [X] 13, 14 * . entire document * [Y] 1-8, 15 | [Y] - GASPANI et al., "In vivo and in vitro Effects of Bromelain on PGE2 and SP Concentrations in the Inflammatory Exudate in Rats", Pharmacology, (20020501), vol. 65, pages 83 - 86, XP009500538 [Y] 1-8, 15 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000056191 | [A] - MYNOTT et al., "Bromelain Prevents Secretion Caused by Vibrio cholerae and Escherichia coli Enterotoxins in Rabbit Ileum In Vitro", Gastroenterology, (19970701), vol. 113, doi:doi:10.1016/S0016-5085(97)70093-3, pages 175 - 184, XP 005688534 [A] 1-15 * . entire document * | [A] - MYNOTT et al., "Oral administration of protease inhibits enterotoxigenic Escherichia coli receptor activity in piglet small intestine", Gut, (19960101), vol. 38, pages 28 - 32, XP 055411985 [A] 1-15 * . entire document * | [A] - FAIBROTHER et al., "Escherichia coli in postweaning diarrhea in pigs: an update on bacterial types, pathogenesis, and prevention strategies", Animal Health Research Reviews., (20050601), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1079/AHR2005105, pages 17 - 39, XP 008176046 [A] 1-15 * . entire document * |