08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
11.06.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
04.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
03.07.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.06.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.06.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.02.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.02.2020 |
Change - German title |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
07.02.2020 |
Change - English title |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
07.02.2020 |
Change - French title |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
02.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.06.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2019 |
First examination report |
|
31.01.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.09.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
26.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
26.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
27.10.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
27.10.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
23.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
02.06.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
02.06.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
05.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
03.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|