Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019249275 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014172281 | 27.08.2014 | JP2014170956 | 25.08.2014 | JP2014170879 | 25.08.2014 | US201715506149 | 23.02.2017 | US201916397472 | 29.04.2019 | WO2015JP73294 | 20.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019249274 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014172281 | 27.08.2014 | JP2014170956 | 25.08.2014 | JP2014170879 | 25.08.2014 | US201715506149 | 23.02.2017 | US201916393233 | 24.04.2019 | WO2015JP73294 | 20.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017283910 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014172281 | 27.08.2014 | JP2014170956 | 25.08.2014 | JP2014170879 | 25.08.2014 | WO2015JP73294 | 20.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102113989B | Global Dossier | 22.05.2020 | B1 | KR20190045417 | 02.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014172281 | 27.08.2014 | JP2014170956 | 25.08.2014 | JP2014170879 | 25.08.2014 | WO2015JP73294 | 20.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102113988B | Global Dossier | 22.05.2020 | B1 | KR20190045418 | 02.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014172281 | 27.08.2014 | JP2014170956 | 25.08.2014 | JP2014170879 | 25.08.2014 | WO2015JP73294 | 20.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102052879B | Global Dossier | 06.12.2019 | B1 | KR20170032455 | 22.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014172281 | 27.08.2014 | JP2014170956 | 25.08.2014 | JP2014170879 | 25.08.2014 | WO2015JP73294 | 20.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016044358 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2016 | A | JP5897084B | 30.03.2016 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014172281 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016044346 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2016 | A | JP5897083B | 30.03.2016 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014170956 | 25.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016044345 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2016 | A | JP5897082B | 30.03.2016 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014170879 | 25.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106795643B | Global Dossier | 05.03.2019 | B | CN106795643 | 31.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014172281 | 27.08.2014 | JP2014170956 | 25.08.2014 | JP2014170879 | 25.08.2014 | WO2015JP73294 | 20.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3187627 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2020 | B1 | EP3187627 | 28.02.2018 | A4 | EP3187627 | 05.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014172281 | 27.08.2014 | JP2014170956 | 25.08.2014 | JP2014170879 | 25.08.2014 | WO2015JP73294 | 20.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016031654 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014172281 | 27.08.2014 | JP2014170956 | 25.08.2014 | JP2014170879 | 25.08.2014 |