EP3179382 - TWO-DIMENSIONAL FILTER GENERATION METHOD, QUERY METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yansong 59 Zhongguancun Street Haidian District Beijing 100872 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Hong 59 Zhongguancun Street Haidian District Beijing 100872 / CN | 03 /
LI, Cuiping 59 Zhongguancun Street Haidian District Beijing 100872 / CN | 04 /
SUN, Dongwang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2017/24] | Application number, filing date | 15836802.7 | 12.02.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015CN72915 | Priority number, date | CN201410431085 | 28.08.2014 Original published format: CN201410431085 | [2017/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016029664 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3179382 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/22, G06F16/901 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
G06F16/2255 (EP,US);
G06F17/16 (CN);
H04L9/3242 (US);
G06F16/9014 (EP,US);
H04L63/061 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN FILTERS, ANFRAGEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2017/24] | English: | TWO-DIMENSIONAL FILTER GENERATION METHOD, QUERY METHOD AND DEVICE | [2017/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE FILTRE BIDIMENSIONNEL, PROCÉDÉ D'INTERROGATION ET DISPOSITIF | [2017/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2017 | Translation filed | 07.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 07.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/01] | 09.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - LIU ET AL, "Pattern Matching Engine Based on Multi-Dimensional Bloom Filters", JISUANJI YINGYONG = JOURNAL OF COMPUTER APPLICAT, JISUANJI YINGYONG, CN, (20110131), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 1001-9081, pages 107 - 109, XP008184618 [I] 1-4,9-12 * page 107 - page 109; figures 2, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3724/SP.J.1087.2011.00107 | International search | [A]US2007130188 (MOON HWA S [KR], et al) [A] 1-16* , the whole document *; | [A]CN101398820 (BEIJING VENUS INFORMATION TECH [CN]) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN101567815 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN]) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN104317795 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-16 * , claims 1-16 *; | [X] - LIU, WEI et al., "Pattern Matching Engine Based on Multi-Dimensional Bloom Filters", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER APPLICATIONS, (20110131), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 1001-9081, pages 107 - 109, XP008184618 [X] 1-16 * , and figures 3 and 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3724/SP.J.1087.2011.00107 |