EP3196681 - SECURITY FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolon Industries, Inc. 110, Magokdong-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07793 / KR | [2019/22] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states Kolon Industries, Inc. (Byeoryang-dong) 11, Kolon-ro Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 13837 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Si Wook 30 Mabuk-ro 154beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-797 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Kyung Jong 30 Mabuk-ro 154beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-797 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jin Young 30 Mabuk-ro 154beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-797 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Chong Won 30 Mabuk-ro 154beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-797 / KR | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 15837349.8 | 07.09.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015KR09426 | Priority number, date | KR20140118990 | 05.09.2014 Original published format: KR 20140118990 | [2017/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016036223 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3196681 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02B5/20, B42D25/328, B42D25/373 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
G02B5/3058 (EP,US);
B42D25/324 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/36 (EP,US);
B42D25/373 (EP,US);
B42D25/445 (EP,US);
G02B5/0215 (US);
G02B5/18 (US);
G02B5/203 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/30] | G02B5/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSFILM | [2017/30] | English: | SECURITY FILM | [2017/30] | French: | PELLICULE PLASTIQUE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2017 | Translation filed | 21.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 21.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 22.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2506065 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0030] - [0077]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2013105076 (HOSHINO HIDEKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0004] - [0067]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US2013215508 (SASAKI KOJI [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0012] - [0052]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2007159577 (ATSUSHI SATO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,6 * paragraphs [0003] - [0073]; figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2014027738 (LEE HYUN-SHIK [KR]) [Y] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0006] - [0052]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2013257032 (ISHIOKA CHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0003] - [0077]; figures 1-7 * | International search | [Y]KR20120123294 (BASF SE) [Y] 1-6 * See abstract, paragraphs [0037]-[0080]and claim 2. *; | [Y]KR20100067252 (MIRAE NANO TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-6 * See abstract, paragraph [0099], claim 1 and figure 6g. *; | [A]KR20120075866 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-6 * See figures 1-4e. *; | [A]KR101206425B (KOREA ADVANCED INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-6 * See figures 1-4. *; | [A]KR20050071490 (INGENIA HOLDINGS LTD [VG], et al) [A] 1-6 * See figures 1-9h. * |