EP3189050 - ANTIVIRAL AGENTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Griffith University 170 Kessels Road Nathan, Queensland 4111 / AU | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON ITZSTEIN, Mark 2/68 Tallebudgera Drive Palm Beach, Queensland 4221 / AU | 02 /
EL-DEEB, Ibrahim 508/33 Clark Street Biggera Waters, Queensland 4216 / AU | 03 /
DIRR, Larissa 232/1 Serisier Avenue Main Beach, Queensland 4217 / AU | 04 /
GUILLON, Patrice 32808/9 Lawson Street Southport, Queensland 4215 / AU | 05 /
WINGER, Moritz 4/ 8 Mary Avenue Broadbeach, Queensland 4218 / AU | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2020/06] |
Former [2017/28] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15837720.0 | 07.09.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015AU50526 | Priority number, date | NL20142013420 | 05.09.2014 Original published format: NL 2013420 | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016033660 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3189050 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3189050 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/351, A61K31/36, A61K31/4025, A61K31/403, A61K31/41, A61K31/4192, C07D405/14, C07D309/28, C07D405/04, C07D407/12, C07D309/08, A61P31/14, A61P31/16 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/4192 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/351 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4025 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/403 (EP,US);
A61K31/4035 (RU);
A61K31/41 (EP,RU,US);
A61P31/12 (EP,RU);
|
Former IPC [2017/28] | C07D405/04, A61K31/4192, A61K31/4035, A61K31/41, A61P31/12, A61P31/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIVIRALE WIRKSTOFFE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/28] | English: | ANTIVIRAL AGENTS AND USES THEREOF | [2017/28] | French: | AGENTS ANTIVIRAUX ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 31.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.02.2020 | CY | 05.02.2020 | EE | 05.02.2020 | HR | 05.02.2020 | LT | 05.02.2020 | LV | 05.02.2020 | MC | 05.02.2020 | MK | 05.02.2020 | MT | 05.02.2020 | PL | 05.02.2020 | RO | 05.02.2020 | RS | 05.02.2020 | SI | 05.02.2020 | SK | 05.02.2020 | SM | 05.02.2020 | BG | 05.05.2020 | GR | 06.05.2020 | IS | 05.06.2020 | PT | 28.06.2020 | LU | 07.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/28] | CY | 05.02.2020 | |
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | EE | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | EE | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | EE | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | RS | 05.02.2020 | |
PT | 28.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO02076971 (BIOCRYST PHARM INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * page 1, lines 6-11 * * page 52; example 26 * * page 63, lines 4-16 * * claims 6, 10 *; | [A]WO2011006237 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 25-26; compound C4Bn * * claims 1, 24, 26, 30, 42 *; | [X] - LI J ET AL, "Syntheses of triazole-modified zanamivir analogues via click chemistry and anti-AIV activities", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 16, no. 19, ISSN 0960-894X, (20061001), pages 5009 - 5013, (20061001), XP027966575 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * table 1 * * page 5012, column 2, paragraph 1 * | [XI] - FENG ENGUANG ET AL, "Recent Advances in Neuraminidase Inhibitor Development as Anti-influenza Drugs", CHEMMEDCHEM, (201209), vol. 7, no. 9, ISSN 1860-7179, pages 1527 - 1536, XP002738547 [X] 1-3,6-8,11-15 * abstract * * page 1529, column 2, paragraph l - page 1530, column 1, paragraph 1 * * figure 6 * [I] 4,5,9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cmdc.201200155 | [X] - LU ET AL, "Synthesis of C-4 and C-7 triazole analogs of zanamivir as multivalent sialic acid containing scaffolds", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, PERGAMON, GB, (20070716), vol. 342, no. 12-13, doi:10.1016/J.CARRES.2007.06.002, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 1636 - 1650, XP022155719 [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * figure 1; compound 2 * * figure scheme 1 * * page 1640; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2007.06.002 | [A] - YE DEJU ET AL, "Synthesis of C-4-modified zanamivir analogs as neuraminidase inhibitors and their anti-AIV activities", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2012), vol. 54, doi:10.1016/J.EJMECH.2012.06.033, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 764 - 770, XP028932621 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * table 1 * * page 767, column 1, paragraph l - column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2012.06.033 | [A] - I. V. ALYMOVA ET AL, "Efficacy of Novel Hemagglutinin-Neuraminidase Inhibitors BCX 2798 and BCX 2855 against Human Parainfluenza Viruses In Vitro and In Vivo", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (20040422), vol. 48, no. 5, doi:10.1128/AAC.48.5.1495-1502.2004, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 1495 - 1502, XP055182866 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1496, column 1, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.48.5.1495-1502.2004 | [A] - TINDAL ET AL, "Synthesis and evaluation of 4-O-alkylated 2-deoxy-2,3-didehydro-N-acetylneuraminic acid derivatives as inhibitors of human parainfluenza virus type-3 sialidase activity", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070220), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2006.12.105, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1655 - 1658, XP005895383 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1656, column 2, paragraph l - page 1657, column 2, paragraph 1 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2006.12.105 | [XDP] - PATRICE GUILLON ET AL, "Structure-guided discovery of potent and dual-acting human parainfluenza virus haemagglutinin-neuraminidase inhibitors", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20141020), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/ncomms6268, page 5268, XP055440108 [XDP] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 4, 5 * * page 7, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 8, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms6268 | International search | [X]WO02076971 (BIOCRYST PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * see page 1 lines 7-11 and lines 15-19; page 3 lines 19-26; page 13 lines 1-2; page 19 scheme 1; claim 9 page 77 lines 15-16 and page 81 lines 9-10; page 51 compound 12; page 52 compound 26; page 63 lines 9-16 and lines 4-5; claims 6-8 *; | [X] - LI, J. et al., "Syntheses of triazole-modified zanamivir analogues via click chemistry and anti-AIV activities", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20060000), vol. 16, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2006.07.047, pages 5009 - 5013, XP027966575 [X] 1-15 and 17-19 * . see abstract; page 5009 left column lines 1-12; compounds 3a and 3f-k in table 1 on page 5010; page 5011 left column lines 6-12. * | [X] - LU, Y. et al., "Synthesis of C-4 and C-7 triazole analogs of zanamivir as multivalent sialic acid containing scaffolds", Carbohydrate Research, (20070000), vol. 342, no. 12-13, doi:doi:10.1016/j.carres.2007.06.002, pages 1636 - 1650, XP029074260 [X] 1-3 and 5-10 * . see compound 8 on page 1640 table 1 and pages 1641-1642; compound 9 on page 1640 table 1 and pages 1642-1643; compound 17 page 1646; compound 18 page 1646. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2007.06.002 | [A] - SHIDMOOSSAVEE, F. S. et al., "Chemical Insight into the Emergence of Influenza Virus Strains that are Resistant to Relenza", Journal of the American Chemical Society, (20130000), vol. 135, no. 36, doi:doi:10.1021/ja405916q, pages 13254 - 13257, XP 055182952 [A] 1-15 and 17-19 * . see compound 2c page 13255 figure 1; page 13254 and page 13255 figure 1. * |