EP3190499 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SWITCHING KEY FUNCTIONS OF TOUCHSCREEN TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiaolei ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15838526.0 | 09.03.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015CN73913 | Priority number, date | CN201410446085 | 03.09.2014 Original published format: CN201410446085 | [2017/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016033951 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3190499 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/0416 (EP,US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/048 (EP,US);
H01H9/181 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMSCHALTUNG VON TASTENFUNKTIONEN EINES BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMENDGERÄTS | [2017/28] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SWITCHING KEY FUNCTIONS OF TOUCHSCREEN TERMINAL | [2017/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CHANGEMENT DE FONCTIONS DES TOUCHES D'UN TERMINAL À ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2017 | Translation filed | 03.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 03.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014149870 (GRIFFIN JASON TYLER [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A]US2004257341 (BEAR ERIC JUSTIN GOULD [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0166]; figures 1-21 * | International search | [X]CN103347134 (SHANGHAI FEIXUN COMM CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0027] and [0035]-[0047] *; | [A]CN103620540 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2012289828 (JENSEN OLE CHRISTIAN [DK], et al) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document * |