Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018256455 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815974546 | 08.05.2018 | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170048446 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US47245 | 27.08.2015 | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017534412 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US47245 | 27.08.2015 | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107072884B | Global Dossier | 08.02.2022 | B | CN107072884 | 18.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US47245 | 27.08.2015 | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2959981 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2023 | C | CA2959981 | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US47245 | 27.08.2015 | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015312212 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US47245 | 27.08.2015 | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3188705 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2024 | B1 | EP3188705 | 14.11.2018 | A4 | EP3188705 | 12.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US47245 | 27.08.2015 | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017004324 | 05.12.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US47245 | 27.08.2015 | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017002901 | 23.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US47245 | 27.08.2015 | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2017110543 | 04.04.2019 | A3 | RU2017110543 | 08.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US47245 | 27.08.2015 | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016036579 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9987200 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2018 | B2 | US2016067149 | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 |