EP3192028 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONDUCTING A CASH-ON-DELIVERY (COD) TRANSACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastercard Asia/Pacific Pte. Ltd. 3 Fraser Street DUO Tower, 17-00 Singapore 189352 / SG | [2018/19] |
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Mastercard Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd. 152 Beach Road 35-00 The Gateway East Singapore 189721 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Amit 103 Evergreen Apartments Sector - 7 Plot - 9 Dwarka New Delhi 110023 / IN | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | Grau, Benjamin Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15839168.0 | 10.09.2015 | [2017/29] | WO2015SG50310 | Priority number, date | IN2014DEL2631 | 12.09.2014 Original published format: IN 2631DE2014 | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016039692 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3192028 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/16, G06Q20/32 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
G06Q20/16 (EP);
G06Q20/3223 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/29] | G06Q20/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER NACHNAHMETRANSAKTION | [2017/29] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONDUCTING A CASH-ON-DELIVERY (COD) TRANSACTION | [2017/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR RÉALISER UNE TRANSACTION CONTRE REMBOURSEMENT (CR) | [2017/29] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 21.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/49] | 22.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2004059652 (YAMAMORI OSAMU [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , pars. [0032]-[0061] & JP 2003-346067 A & TW 200307211 A & HK 1059835 A1 & CN 1460955 A & SG 110050 A1 & KR 10-1004049 B1 *; | [A]JP2002117355 (NETWORK SOLUTIONS KK) [A] 1-18 * , pars. [0034]-[0056] (No Family) *; | [A]JP2002024730 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-18 * , pars. [0071]-[0081] (No Family) *; | [A]US2003173401 (YAMAGAMI TAKAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , pars. [0008]-[0009] & WO 2002/017174 A1 & JP 2004-318909 A & JP 2005-100461 A & US 2005/0082366 A1 & EP 1327946 A1 & AU 8012501 A & TW 200521686 A & TW 200527250 A & CN 1447948 A * |