EP3194624 - METHODS FOR DIAGNOSIS, PROGNOSIS AND MONITORING OF BREAST CANCER AND REAGENTS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garvan Institute of Medical Research 384 Victoria Street Darlinghurst, NSW 2010 / AU | [2022/07] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states Garvan Institute of Medical Research 384 Victoria Street Darlinghurst, NSW 2010 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Susan 41 Bellevue Street Chatswood, New South Wales 2067 / AU | 02 /
ZOTENKO, Elena 73/3 Foy Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | 03 /
STIRZAKER, Clare 11 Chelmsford Avenue Lindfield, New South Wales 2070 / AU | 04 /
FRANCIS, Glenn 9 Pebble Creek Road Bonogin, Queensland 4213 / AU | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Myint, Julie Marie, et al Symbiosis IP Limited Cardiff MediCentre Heath Park Cardiff CF14 4UJ / GB | [2022/07] |
Former [2017/30] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15841542.2 | 15.09.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015AU50549 | Priority number, date | AU20140903680 | 15.09.2014 Original published format: AU 2014903680 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016041010 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3194624 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3194624 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/30] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE, PROGNOSE UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON BRUSTKREBS UND REAGENZIEN DAFÜR | [2017/30] | English: | METHODS FOR DIAGNOSIS, PROGNOSIS AND MONITORING OF BREAST CANCER AND REAGENTS THEREFOR | [2017/30] | French: | MÉTHODES POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC, LE PRONOSTIC ET LA SURVEILLANCE DU CANCER DU SEIN ET RÉACTIFS CORRESPONDANTS | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 07.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2015 | AL | 16.02.2022 | AT | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | CZ | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | ES | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | IT | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | MT | 16.02.2022 | NL | 16.02.2022 | PL | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SE | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | TR | 16.02.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | NO | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | IS | 17.06.2022 | IE | 15.09.2022 | LU | 15.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
TR | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.09.2022 | ||
LU | 15.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.09.2022 | ||
LU | 15.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.09.2022 | ||
LU | 15.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.09.2022 | ||
LU | 15.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.09.2022 | ||
LU | 15.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.09.2022 | ||
LU | 15.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.09.2022 | ||
LU | 15.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
LU | 15.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO02059347 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED [US]) [X] 11-15 * pages 29-36; example 1; claims 1-3, 16 * [A] 1-10; | [X]WO2004044123 (ROSETTA GENOMICS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 11-15* sequence 228624 *; | [A]EP1942197 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,9-15 * claim 1; sequence 32556 *; | [X]WO2010150103 (UNIV STRASBOURG [FR], et al) [X] 11-15 * sequence 8 *; | [I]WO2012038837 (STICHTING NL KANKER INST [NL], et al) [I] 1-3,9-15 * paragraphs [0183] , [0203] - [0206]; example 2; table 6 *; | [XA]US2012184455 (FOEKENS JOHN [NL], et al) [X] 11-15 * item 8; page 18; table 1 * [A] 4-10; | [I]WO2012129352 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [I] 1-3,9-15 * paragraph [0294]; claim 45; table 16 *; | [I] - M T BRANHAM ET AL, "Methylation profile of triple-negative breast carcinomas", ONCOGENESIS, (20120701), vol. 1, no. 7, doi:10.1038/oncsis.2012.17, page e17, XP055418616 [I] 1-3,9-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/oncsis.2012.17 | [I] - PRIYANKA SHARMA ET AL, "The prognostic value of BRCA1 promoter methylation in early stage triple negative breast cancer", JOURNAL OF CANCER THERAPEUTICS AND RESEARCH, (20140101), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.7243/2049-7962-3-2, pages 1 - 11, XP055418630 [I] 1-3,9-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7243/2049-7962-3-2 | [X] - Ncbi, "Homo sapiens chromosome 8 open reading frame 88 (C8orf88), mRNA - NCBI Reference Sequence: NM_001190972.1", (20140227), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/nuccore/302318879?sat=21&satkey=4818115, (20180309), XP055458048 [X] 11-15 * the whole document * | [XA] - LUCIANO CASCIONE ET AL, "Integrated MicroRNA and mRNA Signatures Associated with Survival in Triple Negative Breast Cancer", PLOS ONE, (20130206), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0055910, page e55910, XP055165763 [X] 11-15 * the whole document * [A] 4-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0055910 | [XA] - MASANORI KANEUCHI ET AL, "WT1 andWT1-AS genes are inactivated by promoter methylation in ovarian clear cell adenocarcinoma", CANCER., US, (20051101), vol. 104, no. 9, doi:10.1002/cncr.21397, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 1924 - 1930, XP055491400 [X] 11-15 * the whole document * [A] 4-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.21397 | [XA] - MIYOSHI Y ET AL, "High expression of Wilms' tumor suppressor gene predicts poor prognosis in breast cancer patients", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20020501), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1167 - 1171, XP002373767 [X] 11-15 * abstract * * page 1170, column 2, paragraph 2 * [A] 4-10 | [XA] - ROBERT KORNEGOOR ET AL, "Promoter hypermethylation in male breast cancer: analysis by multiplex ligation-dependent probe amplification", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH, CURRENT MEDICINE GROUP LTD, GB, (20120705), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1186/BCR3220, ISSN 1465-5411, page R101, XP021127722 [X] 11-15 * abstract * [A] 4-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/bcr3220 | [XA] - LOEB D M ET AL, "Wilm's tumor suppressor gene (WT1) is expressed in primary breast tumors despite tumor-specific promoter methylation", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20010201), vol. 61, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 921 - 925, XP002963863 [X] 11-15 * abstract * [A] 4-10 | [XA] - DIEGO M. MARZESE ET AL, "DNA Methylation Index and Methylation Profile of Invasive Ductal Breast Tumors", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS,THE, US, (20121101), vol. 14, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.jmoldx.2012.07.001, ISSN 1525-1578, pages 613 - 622, XP055491544 [X] 11-15 * abstract * * page 617, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 619, column 2, paragraph 2 * [A] 4-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmoldx.2012.07.001 | [XA] - CATHY B MOELANS ET AL, "Frequent promoter hypermethylation of BRCA2, CDH13, MSH6, PAX5, PAX6 and WT1 in ductal carcinoma in situ and invasive breast cancer", THE JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (20111001), vol. 225, no. 2, doi:10.1002/path.2930, ISSN 0022-3417, pages 222 - 231, XP055491415 [X] 11-15 * the whole document * [A] 4-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/path.2930 | [XA] - TOMASZ K WOJDACZ ET AL, "Identification and characterization of locus-specific methylation patterns within novel loci undergoing hypermethylation during breast cancer pathogenesis", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH, CURRENT MEDICINE GROUP LTD, GB, (20140203), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1186/BCR3612, ISSN 1465-5411, page R17, XP021179705 [X] 11-15 * abstract * [A] 4-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/bcr3612 | [XA] - DOUGLAS E LAUX ET AL, "Hypermethylation of the Wilms' tumor suppressor gene CpG island in human breast carcinomas", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (19990701), vol. 56, no. 1, ISSN 1573-7217, pages 35 - 43, XP019274516 [X] 11-15 * abstract * [A] 4-10 | [XA] - EMANUEL MARTÍN CAMPOY ET AL, "Aberrant DNA Methylation in Breast Cancer Cells", MEDICAL EPIGENETICS, (20130101), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1159/000355616, pages 88 - 92, XP055491409 [X] 11-15 * the whole document * [A] 4-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000355616 | [XA] - ZE-GUANG HAN ET AL, "Molecular Cloning of Six Novel Krüppel -like Zinc Finger Genes from Hematopoietic Cells and Identification of a Novel Transregulatory Domain KRNB", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (19991210), vol. 274, no. 50, doi:10.1074/jbc.274.50.35741, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 35741 - 35748, XP055491706 [X] 11-15 * the whole document * [A] 4-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.50.35741 | [P] - "Sequence 228624 from Patent EP1572962.", EMBL, (20150617), Database accession no. JD247600, URL: EBI [P] * sequence . * | International search | [XA]WO0106005 (UNIV BRISTOL [GB], et al) [X] 23-27, 32-35 * Abstract; page 10, last paragraph; Figure 1; page 7, last paragraph; claims 20, 35 * [A] 1-22, 23-31; | [L]WO2012098215 (UNIV BRUXELLES [BE], et al) [L] 0 * Lack of Unity *; | [A]WO2012106559 (TRANSLATIONAL GENOMICS RES INST [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * Claims; Table 21; para [0071] *; | [L]WO2013012781 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [L] 0 * Lack of Unity *; | [A] - BRANHAM, M. et al., "Methylation profile f triple-negative breast carcinomas", Oncoenesis, (20120000), vol. 1, page e1 7, XP055418616 [A] 1-35 * Abstract; Results; Figures 1 and 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/oncsis.2012.17 | [A] - KOWALSKI, J. et al., "Methylation signatures specific to triple negative breast cancer subtypes", Proceedings of the AACR Special Conference on Chromatin and Epigenetics in Cancer, Atlanta, Georgia, USA, (20130619), vol. 73, no. 13, XP055418621 [A] 1-35 * Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.CEC13-B40 | [A] - SHARMA, P. et al., "The prognostic value of BRCA1 promoter methylation in early stage triple negative breast cancer", Journal of Cancer Therapeutics & Research, (20140319), vol. 3, pages 1 - 11, XP055418630 [A] 1-35 * Abstract; Conclusions * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7243/2049-7962-3-2 | [PX] - STIRZAKER, C. et al., "Methylome sequencing in triple-negative breast cancer reveals distinct methylation clusters with prognostic value", Nature Communications, (20150202), vol. 6, no. 5899, XP055418632 [PX] 1-35 * The Entire Document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms6899 | by applicant | US4492762 | US4593089 | US4668640 | US4751190 | EP0320308 | US4847209 | US4883750 | US5143854 | WO9617958 | US5571728 | WO9849557 | US5837832 | US6174670 | WO0106005 | US6248597 | US6306610 | US6514770 | WO03072810 | US2004228761 | US2004248322 | US2004265926 | - NARANG et al., Meth. Enzymol, (19790000), vol. 68, page 90 | - BEAUCAGE et al., Tetrahedron Letters, (19810000), vol. 22, pages 1859 - 1862 | - CARUTHERS, M. H. et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19880000), vol. 154, pages 287 - 314 | - NIELSEN et al., J. Chem. Soc. Perkin Trans., (19970000), vol. 1, page 3423 | - SINGHWENGEL, Chem. Commun., (19980000), page 1247 | - EGHOLM et al., Am. Chem. Soc., (19920000), vol. 114, page 1895 | - EGHOLM et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 365, page 566 | - ORUM et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, page 5332 | - KAWAI et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19940000), vol. 14, pages 7421 - 7427 | - GONZALGO et al., Cancer Res, (19970000), vol. 57, pages 594 - 599 | - FROMMER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 93, pages 9821 - 9826 | - SINGER-SAM et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, page 687 | - FODOR et al., Science, (19910000), pages 767 - 773 | - SZABOMANN, Genes Dev, (19950000), vol. 9, pages 3097 - 3108 | - CLARK et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19940000), vol. 22, pages 2990 - 2997 | - UHLMANN et al., Electrophoresis, (20020000), vol. 23, pages 4072 - 4079 | - GONZALGOJONES, Nucl. Acids Res., (20010000), vol. 25, pages 2532 - 2534 | - SYVAMEN et al., Genomics, (19920000), vol. 13, pages 1008 - 1017 | - CHENKWOK, Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 347 - 353 | - GONZALGO et al., Cancer Res., (19970000), vol. 57, pages 594 - 599 | - ADORJAN et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (20020000), vol. 30, page e21 | - KUPPUSWAMY et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 1143 - 1147 | - SINGER-SAM et al., PCR Methods Appl, (19920000), vol. 1, pages 160 - 163 | - WORM et al., Clin. Chem., (20010000), vol. 47, pages 1183 - 1189 | - HOLLAND et al., Proc. Natl Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 7276 - 7280 | - LEE et al., Nucleic Acid Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 3761 - 3766 | - EADS et al., Nucl. Acids Res, (20000000), vol. 28, page E32 | - MHLANGMALMBERG, Methods, (20010000), vol. 25, pages 463 - 471 | - BIANCO et al., Hum. Mutat., (19990000), vol. 14, pages 289 - 293 | - ABRAMSSTANTON, Methods Enzymol., (19920000), vol. 212, pages 71 - 74 | - DENG et al., Chin. J. Cancer Res., (20000000), vol. 12, pages 171 - 191 | - HSU et al., Methods Mol Biol, (20140000), vol. 1105, pages 61 - 70 | - SERRE et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (20100000), vol. 38, pages 391 - 399 | - RAUCHPFEIFER, Lab Invest, (20050000), vol. 85, pages 1172 - 1180 | - NAIR et al., Epigenetics, (20110000), vol. 6, pages 34 - 44 | - ROBINSON et al., Genome Res, (20100000), vol. 20, pages 1719 - 1729 | - LEE et al., Proteomics, (20030000), vol. 3, pages 2289 - 2304 | - PAVLICKOVA et al., Biotechniques, (20030000), vol. 34, pages 124 - 130 | - ARENKOV et al., Anal. Biochem., (20000000), vol. 278, pages 123 - 131 | - PEROU et al., Nature, (20000000), vol. 406, pages 747 - 752 | - ERNST et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 473, pages 43 - 49 | - PEROU CM, Oncologist, (20110000), vol. 16, pages 61 - 70 | - BLOWS et al., PLoSMed., (20100000), vol. 7, page el000279 | - JATOI et al., Journal of Clinical Oncology, (20110000), vol. 29, pages 2301 - 2304 | - PARK et al., Annals of Oncology, (20110000), vol. 22, pages 1554 - 1560 | - REIS-FILHOPUSZTAI, The Lancet, (20110000), vol. 378, pages 1812 - 1823 | - Nature, TCGA, (20120000), vol. 490, pages 61 - 70 | - LAIRD PW, Nat. Rev. Cancer, (20030000), vol. 3, pages 253 - 266 | - MEHLEN et al., Nat. Rev. Cancer, (20110000), vol. 11, pages 188 - 197 | - NEUFELDKESSLER, Nat. Rev. Cancer, (20080000), vol. 8, pages 632 - 645 | - YANG et al., Leukemia, (20070000), vol. 21, pages 868 - 876 | WO2002AU01684 | WO2003AU00244 |