EP3194685 - MODULAR STORAGE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cornia, Anthony 566 Belle Ridge St. North Wilkesboro, North Carolina 28659 / US | For all designated states Lira, Francisco 281 Alonzo McNeil Rd. Millers Creek, North Carolina 28651 / US | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 15842163.6 | 18.09.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015US51099 | Priority number, date | US201462052346P | 18.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462052346 P | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016044815 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3194685 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3194685 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E04H1/00, E04B1/08 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
E04C2/38 (EP,US);
E04B1/08 (EP,US);
E04C2/44 (US);
E04C2/46 (EP,US);
E04H7/04 (EP,US);
E04H7/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/30] | E04H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE SPEICHERSTRUKTUR | [2017/30] | English: | MODULAR STORAGE STRUCTURE | [2017/30] | French: | STRUCTURE DE STOCKAGE MODULAIRE | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 13.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1778889 (DISBRO ROGER W); | [XY]US6415557 (MCCALLEY RICHARD M [US]); | [XY]US6415558 (CHERRY CHARLES W [US]); | [XY]US7356970 (FROBOSILO RAYMOND C [US]); | [Y]US2012000139 (WILLIAMS MICHAEL H [US]) | International search | [XY]US1778889 (DISBRO ROGER W); | [XY]US6415557 (MCCALLEY RICHARD M [US]); | [Y]US6568144 (MEREDITH HAROLD F [CA]); | [A]US7080489 (JEDRZEJEWSKI RICHARD [US]); | [A]US7356970 (FROBOSILO RAYMOND C [US]); | [Y]US8146314 (NGUYEN HUNG T [US]) |