EP3174366 - BASEBAND PROCESSING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Yijing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Haoliang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Ying Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15842313.7 | 08.09.2015 | [2017/22] | WO2015CN89186 | Priority number, date | CN201420536195U | 17.09.2014 Original published format: CN 201420536195 U | [2017/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016041455 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3174366 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3174366 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/18, // G02B6/26 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
H04W88/08 (EP);
G02B6/4278 (EP);
H05K1/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | H04W88/08, H05K1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BASISBANDVERARBEITUNGSEINHEIT | [2017/22] | English: | BASEBAND PROCESSING UNIT | [2017/22] | French: | UNITÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE BANDE DE BASE | [2017/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2017 | Translation filed | 24.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 24.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2015 | AL | 13.03.2019 | AT | 13.03.2019 | CY | 13.03.2019 | CZ | 13.03.2019 | DK | 13.03.2019 | EE | 13.03.2019 | ES | 13.03.2019 | FI | 13.03.2019 | HR | 13.03.2019 | IT | 13.03.2019 | LT | 13.03.2019 | LV | 13.03.2019 | MC | 13.03.2019 | MK | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | NL | 13.03.2019 | PL | 13.03.2019 | RO | 13.03.2019 | RS | 13.03.2019 | SE | 13.03.2019 | SI | 13.03.2019 | SK | 13.03.2019 | SM | 13.03.2019 | TR | 13.03.2019 | BG | 13.06.2019 | NO | 13.06.2019 | GR | 14.06.2019 | IS | 13.07.2019 | PT | 13.07.2019 | IE | 08.09.2019 | LU | 08.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | FR | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.09.2015 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 08.09.2015 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006029332 (CHIU LIEW C [SG], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0129] *; | [A]US2008070439 (KUSUDA KIYONORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0098]; figure 10 *; | [A]US2011217009 (BURRELL GARY RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2012314374 (ELKASLASSY DANIEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]CN101149448 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * , claims 1-8, description, page 1, paragraphs 2-3, page 7, 3rd to last paragraph to page 9, paragraph 3, page 10, 4th to last paragraph to page 11, 4th to last paragraph and page 14, penultimate paragraph to page 15, paragraph 2, and figures 1A-1B, 7, 8A-8C, 9A-9B, 14B, 17A-17C, 18 and 19 *; | [A]CN102291185 (EOPTOLINK TECHNOLOGY, INC.) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102883355 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2013210275 (FISH ILAN [IL], et al) [A] 1-10* , the whole document *; | [PX]CN204090161U (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , claims 1-10 * |