EP3193661 - CONTAINER WITH QUICK RELEASE BASE AND LID ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HCT Group Holdings Limited 11 Duddell Street Dina House (Building) Unit 202 2nd Floor Central Hong Kong / CN | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APODACA, Adrian Charles 863 Green Ridge Drive, Apt 3 Daly City, California 94014 / US | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 15842455.6 | 18.09.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015US50961 | Priority number, date | US201462052101P | 18.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462052101 P | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016044737 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193661 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/26, B65D41/02, B65D43/02, B65D51/32, A45D34/04 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
A45D34/045 (EP,US);
A45D40/265 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/30] | A45D40/30, B65D41/02, B65D43/02, B65D51/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER MIT SCHNELL LÖSBARER BASIS- UND DECKELANORDNUNG | [2017/30] | English: | CONTAINER WITH QUICK RELEASE BASE AND LID ASSEMBLY | [2017/30] | French: | CONTENANT À ENSEMBLE COUVERCLE ET BASE À LIBÉRATION RAPIDE | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 13.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012279876 (WEIGEL FRIEDRICH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0050]; figure 4 * | International search | [X]US2012279876 (WEIGEL, F.) [X] 1-6, 13-21 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0071]; claims 1-10; figures 1-11. *; | [A]US2008273914 (HAMADA, M.) [A] 1-6, 13-21 * See paragraphs [0075]-[142]; figures 1-16. *; | [A]US7118298 (TSUTSUMI, Y.) [A] 1-6, 13-21 * See column 4, line 53 - column 12, line 45; figures 1A-16C. *; | [A]US5934815 (HURLBURT, D. R.) [A] 1-6, 13-21 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US5913631 (LANDRY, T. M.) [A] 1-6, 13-21 * See the whole document. * |