EP3237604 - METHODS OF CULTURING A MAMMALIAN CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 50 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Christopher 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Timothy 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 03 /
WALTHER, Jason 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 04 /
CHENG, Cheng 500 Kendall Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | 05 /
WANG, Jonathan 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 06 /
SHAH, Neha 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 07 /
BAE, Seul-A 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15843061.1 | 21.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015US67040 | Priority number, date | US201462095734P | 22.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462095734 P | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016106192 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3237604 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
C12N5/0043 (EP,IL,US);
C12P21/00 (IL,US);
C12N5/00 (RU);
C12N5/0682 (KR);
C07K16/00 (IL,US);
C12N5/005 (EP,IL,US);
C12N9/2465 (KR);
C07K2317/14 (IL,US);
C12N2500/50 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Extension states | BA | 19.07.2017 | ME | 19.07.2017 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KULTIVIERUNG VON SÄUGERZELLEN | [2017/44] | English: | METHODS OF CULTURING A MAMMALIAN CELL | [2017/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CULTURE DE CELLULES DE MAMMIFÈRE | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 19.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2019/31] | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2015188009 (AMGEN INC [US]) [XP] 1-4,12-14,18,32-36,40-42,46-52* the whole document *; | [XI] - Karin Tördahl ET AL, "Study of a perfusion process of Chinese Hamster Ovary cells by ATF filtration in bioreactor Ovary cells by ATF filtration in bioreactor", (20090911), URL: http://www.refinetech.com/media/downloads/kth-thesis-presentation-atf-perfusion-in-cho.pdf, (20160520), XP055274145 [X] 1-4,8-14,18,32-36,40-42,81-90 * the whole document * [I] 46-52 | [T] - MANOHAR KATAKAM ET AL, "Effect of Surfactants on the Physical Stability of Recombinant Human Growth Hormone", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, (19950601), vol. 84, no. 6, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 713 - 716, XP002114576 [T] * the whole document * | by applicant | US2012164066 | - GEBAUER ET AL., CURRENT OPIN. CHEM. BIOL., (2009), vol. 13, pages 245 - 255 |