EP3198161 - PLATE CARRYING DEVICE, MULTIPLATE CLUTCH OR BRAKE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLATE CARRYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2019/33] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states Borgwarner Inc. Patent Department 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | ||
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states Borgwarner Inc. Patent Department 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARVIZIAN, Farhad Landhausstrasse 8 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
SKOP-CARDARELLA, Katharina Lindenstrasse 6 67346 Speyer / DE | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Leckel, Ulf Leckel-Patentanwaltskanzlei Speyerer Straße 6 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | Leckel, Ulf LECKEL Patentanwaltskanzlei Postfach 12 11 22 68062 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2017/31] | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 15843687.3 | 15.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015US50075 | Priority number, date | DE20141014235 | 25.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014014235 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016048706 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3198161 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3198161 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/68 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
F16D13/683 (EP,US);
B21D53/04 (EP,US);
F16D55/00 (EP,US);
F16D13/74 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0008 (EP,US);
F16D2250/0023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2019/25] |
Former [2017/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTENTRAGVORRICHTUNG, LAMELLENKUPPLUNG ODER BREMSE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PLATTENTRAGVORRICHTUNG | [2017/31] | English: | PLATE CARRYING DEVICE, MULTIPLATE CLUTCH OR BRAKE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLATE CARRYING DEVICE | [2017/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTE-PLATEAUX, EMBRAYAGE OU FREIN À PLATEAUX MULTIPLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN DISPOSITIF PORTE-PLATEAUX | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 14.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1645765 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-14 * column 31 - column 61; figures 1-10 * [A] 4,5; | [X]WO2006093396 (JINMYUNG FRICTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,9-14 * page 9, line 25 - page 32, line 19; figures 1-32 *; | [A]DE102007029005 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]US6158265 (PRATER RONALD E [US]) [A] 1-4* See abstract and column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 60. *; | [A]US2004035667 (PRATER RONALD E [US]) [A] 1-4 * See paragraphs [0006]-[0009], [0018]-[0029] and figures 1-4B. *; | [A]US2009229939 (GOLD ECKART [DE]) [A] 1-4 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0057] and figures 1-12. *; | [X]EP2110574 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * See claims 1-7 and figures 1-7. *; | [A]US2013126291 (HAUCK HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-4 * See paragraphs [0024]-[0052] and figures 1-2. * |