EP3198657 - SOLAR CELL INTERCONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maxeon Solar Pte. Ltd. 8 Marina Boulevard 05-02 Marina Bay Financial Centre Singapore 018981 / SG | [2022/08] |
Former [2021/46] | For all designated states Maxeon Solar Pte. Ltd. 8 Marina Boulevard 05-02 Marina Bay Financial Centre Singapore 018981 / SG | ||
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states SunPower Corporation 77 Rio Robles San Jose, CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASS, Thomas P. 1588 Willowgate Drive San Jose, California 95118 / US | 02 /
HARLEY, Gabriel 680 Farley Street Mountain View CA 94043 / US | 03 /
KAVULAK, David Fredric Joel 4877 Oscar Court Fremont, California 94538 / US | 04 /
SEWELL, Richard Hamilton 545 Covington Road Los Altos, California 94024 / US | [2017/33] |
Former [2017/31] | 01 /
PASS, Thomas P. 1588 Willowgate Drive San Jose, California 95118 / US | ||
02 /
HARLEY, Gabriel 600 Farley Street Mountain View, California 94043 / US | |||
03 /
KAVULAK, David Fredric Joel 4877 Oscar Court Fremont, California 94538 / US | |||
04 /
SEWELL, Richard Hamilton 545 Covington Road Los Altos, California 94024 / US | Representative(s) | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2022/08] |
Former [2017/31] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15843948.9 | 22.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015US51562 | Priority number, date | US201414496226 | 25.09.2014 Original published format: US201414496226 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016049092 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3198657 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3198657 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/05, H01L31/042, H01L31/18, H01L31/068, H01L31/0745 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
H01L31/0512 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L31/0508 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23K31/02 (CN,US);
H01L31/05 (CN,US);
H01L31/0504 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/0682 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/0745 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/18 (CN,US);
H01L31/1876 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/31] | H01L31/05, H01L31/042, H01L31/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOLARZELLENVERBINDUNG | [2017/31] | English: | SOLAR CELL INTERCONNECTION | [2017/31] | French: | INTERCONNEXION DE CELLULES SOLAIRES | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 24.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2015 | AL | 23.02.2022 | AT | 23.02.2022 | CY | 23.02.2022 | CZ | 23.02.2022 | DK | 23.02.2022 | EE | 23.02.2022 | FI | 23.02.2022 | HR | 23.02.2022 | LT | 23.02.2022 | LV | 23.02.2022 | MC | 23.02.2022 | MK | 23.02.2022 | MT | 23.02.2022 | NL | 23.02.2022 | PL | 23.02.2022 | RO | 23.02.2022 | RS | 23.02.2022 | SE | 23.02.2022 | SI | 23.02.2022 | SK | 23.02.2022 | SM | 23.02.2022 | BG | 23.05.2022 | NO | 23.05.2022 | GR | 24.05.2022 | IS | 23.06.2022 | PT | 23.06.2022 | IE | 22.09.2022 | LU | 22.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 22.09.2015 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 22.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 22.09.2015 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 22.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.09.2015 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 22.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 22.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 22.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 22.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1981090 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-14 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0079]; figures 15-18 *; | [A]JP2010073445 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]JP2010141050 (HITACHI CABLE, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2011028630 (STANCEL ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044]; figures 3,4 *; | [XAI]US2013312809 (LUCH DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11,12 * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0282] - paragraph [0312]; figures 3,5,6,7 * * paragraph [0375] - paragraph [0386]; figures 22-29 * [A] 3-8,14,15 [I] 10,13 | International search | [A]US2010108122 (EVERSON SHAWN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0093]-[0107]; and figures 4A-4E. *; | [A]US2010218824 (LUCH DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0199]-[0203]; and figures 24-26A. *; | [A]US2012080079 (CORNEILLE JASON S [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0027]-[0032]; and figures 6, 7. *; | [A]US2012192918 (ZHOU ZUOCHENG [CN], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0024]-[0032]; and figures 3-5. *; | [X]US2013312809 (LUCH DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0082], [0293]-[0312], [0375]-[0386]; and figures 6, 22-25. * | by applicant | US2013312809 |