EP3200511 - BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUI, Katsuhiro c/o KYOCERA Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 02 /
FUJISHIRO, Masato c/o KYOCERA Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 03 /
MORITA, Kugo c/o KYOCERA Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 04 /
NAGASAKA, Yushi c/o KYOCERA Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15844769.8 | 24.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015JP76886 | Priority number, date | JP20140197611 | 26.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014197611 | [2017/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016047670 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200511 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, // H04W36/22, H04W28/08 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
H04W36/0061 (EP,US);
H04W36/22 (US);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W88/08 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/31] | H04W48/18, H04W28/08, H04W36/14, H04W48/08, H04W92/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Title | German: | BASISSTATION | [2017/31] | English: | BASE STATION | [2017/31] | French: | STATION DE BASE | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2017 | Translation filed | 23.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 23.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007224988 (SHAHEEN KAMEL M [US]); | [XI]WO2009120898 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2014087235 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]); | [XI]WO2014133359 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [E]EP2963976 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); |