EP3198091 - MULTI PARAMETER SWIMMING POOL FLUID ANALYSIS AND REGULATING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maytronics Ltd. Kibbutz Yizrael 1935000 Kibbutz Yizrael / IL | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIZHACK, Tamir 9/76 Yigal-alon St. 26431 Kiryat Motskin / IL | 02 /
PERETZ, Shay 32 Zoran St. Pob 218 17906 Shimshit / IL | 03 /
HILEL, Gil Kibbuts Yizrael 19350 Kibbuts Yizrael / IL | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Hunter, Christopher Jack Owen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5a planta 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15845202.9 | 21.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015IB57246 | Priority number, date | US201462053820P | 23.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462053820 P | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016046719 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3198091 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 31.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E04H4/12, E04H4/16, G01N21/15, G01N21/33, G01N21/3577, G01N21/359, G01N21/64, G01N33/18 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
G01N33/1826 (EP,IL,US);
G01N21/6486 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/18 (IL,US);
E04H4/1272 (EP,IL,US);
E04H4/1654 (EP,IL,US);
G01J3/00 (IL,US);
G01J3/42 (IL,US);
G01N21/00 (IL,US);
G01N21/15 (EP,IL,US);
G01N21/33 (EP,IL,US);
G01N21/3577 (EP,IL,US);
G01N21/359 (EP,IL,US);
C02F2103/42 (EP,IL,US);
C02F2209/003 (EP,IL,US);
G01N2021/152 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/31] | E04H4/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Title | German: | SCHWIMMBECKENFLÜSSIGKEITSANALYSE MIT MEHREREN PARAMETERN UND REGELVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2017/31] | English: | MULTI PARAMETER SWIMMING POOL FLUID ANALYSIS AND REGULATING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2017/31] | French: | ANALYSE DE FLUIDE DE PISCINE MULTIPARAMÉTRIQUE, PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 24.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 05.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9618096 (NORTH WEST WATER GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 10 * * page 1, line 3 - line 12 * * page 10, line 1 - page 16, line 10 *; | [X]EP0885986 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP], et al) [X] 9 * abstract * * figures 1,9 * * page 4, line 28 - line 45 *; | [A]US2006219630 (ABE NORIMITUS [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2009068477 (SIEMENS WATER TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2012144955 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 3-6,11,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012273351 (KRAUS PAUL R [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0047] - [0051] - [0075] - [0079] * | International search | [Y]DE19515428 (L V H T LEHR UND VERSUCHSGESEL [DE], et al) [Y] 30,48* ABSTRACT *; | [XY] - BOZENA SEREDYNSKA-SOBECKA et al., "Monitoring organic loading to swimming pools by fluorescence excitation - emission matrix with parallel factor analysis (PARAFAC).", ARTICLE in WATER RESEARCH - MARCH 2011, (20110331), XP028366306 [X] 1-29,31-47,49-60 * The whole document The whole document * [Y] 30,48 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.watres.2011.01.010 | by applicant | US5242602 | WO9618096 | EP0885986 | US2006219630 | US2008285012 | WO2009068477 | WO2012144955 | US2012273351 | - "Henry's Law Constant of N, N-Dichloromethylamine: Application to the Contamination of the Atmosphere of Indoor Swimming Pools", CIMETIERE N et al., Chemosphere, Pergamon Press, (20091001), vol. 77 | - "Variability of Chlorination By-Product Occurring in Water of Indoor and Outdoor Swimming Pools", SIMARD SABRINA et al., Water Research, Elsevier, (20130103), vol. 47, pages 1763 - 1772 |