EP3214102 - BLOCK COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2022/01] |
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jung Keun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Je Gwon LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jeong Kyu LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
KU, Se Jin LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
PARK, No Jin LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Mi Sook LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 07 /
CHOI, Eun Young LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 08 /
YOON, Sung Soo LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 09 /
RYU, Hyung Ju LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/36] | Application number, filing date | 15845665.7 | 30.09.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015KR10335 | Priority number, date | KR20140131964 | 30.09.2014 Original published format: KR 20140131964 | KR20140175411 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175411 | KR20140175414 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175414 | KR20140175410 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175410 | KR20140175415 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175415 | KR20140175412 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175412 | KR20140175413 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175413 | KR20140175407 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175407 | KR20140175406 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175406 | KR20140175400 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175400 | KR20140175401 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175401 | KR20140175402 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175402 | KR20150079490 | 04.06.2015 Original published format: KR 20150079490 | [2017/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016053011 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3214102 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3214102 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08F293/00, C08J5/18, G03F7/00 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
B81C1/00428 (EP,US);
H01L21/0273 (CN,US);
B05D1/005 (US);
B05D3/007 (US);
C07C69/54 (US);
C08F2/14 (US);
C08F212/08 (EP,CN,US);
C08F212/14 (CN);
C08F216/12 (EP,CN,US);
C08F220/10 (US);
C08F220/14 (EP,US);
C08F220/26 (US);
C08F293/00 (US);
C08F293/005 (EP,US);
C08F297/00 (CN);
C08F299/00 (CN);
C08F299/024 (US);
C08F32/06 (US);
C08G61/08 (US);
C08G61/12 (US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08J7/123 (US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C08L53/005 (US);
C08L53/02 (US);
C09D153/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/0002 (EP,US);
G03F7/0046 (US);
G03F7/039 (US);
G03F7/091 (US);
G03F7/16 (US);
G03F7/162 (US);
G03F7/165 (US);
G03F7/2004 (US);
G03F7/30 (US);
H01L21/027 (US);
H01L21/0274 (CN);
H01L21/0332 (EP,US);
H01L21/31055 (US);
H01L21/31056 (US);
H01L21/31058 (US);
B81C2201/0149 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01P2002/70 (US);
C07B2200/00 (US);
C08F220/301 (EP,US);
C08F2438/03 (EP,US);
C08G2261/1424 (US);
C08G2261/1426 (US);
C08G2261/332 (US);
C08G2261/3324 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/14, C08F212/20, C08F220/325 (US,EP);
C08F220/14, C08F214/14, C08F220/325 (US);
C08F220/301, C08F214/182 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | C08F297/00, C08F299/00, C08F212/08, C08F220/10, C08J5/18, G03F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLOCKCOPOLYMER | [2017/36] | English: | BLOCK COPOLYMER | [2017/36] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE BLOC | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2017 | Translation filed | 30.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2015 | AL | 05.01.2022 | AT | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | CZ | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | ES | 05.01.2022 | FI | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | IT | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | MT | 05.01.2022 | NL | 05.01.2022 | PL | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SE | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | NO | 05.04.2022 | GR | 06.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | IE | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | LU | 30.09.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 30.09.2015 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 30.09.2015 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.09.2015 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 05.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5234604 (LIAO WEN P [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,12,13,15* column 2, line 40-column 3, line 3: claims *; | [E]EP3078654 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]EP3078694 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]EP3078692 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [L] - ANONYMOUS, "Solid surface energy data (SFE) for common polymers", INTERNET CITATION, (20170225), URL: http://www.surface-tension.de/solid-surface-energy.htm, (20171102), XP002775246 | [X] - MORI H ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND SURFACE CHARACTERIZATION OF HYDROPHILIC-HYDROPHOBIC BLOCK COPOLYMERS CONTAINING POLY(2,3-DIHYDROXYPROPYL METHACRYLATE)", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19940718), vol. 27, no. 15, doi:10.1021/MA00093A010, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 4093 - 4100, XP000456650 [X] 1-6,9,12,13,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00093a010 | [X] - LUTZ FUNK ET AL, "Novel Amphiphilic Styrene-Based Block Copolymers for Induced Surface Reconstruction", MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS., DE, (20080104), vol. 209, no. 1, doi:10.1002/macp.200700312, ISSN 1022-1352, pages 52 - 63, XP055382259 [X] 1-6,9,12,13,15 * scheme 1, monomers M1 M4 ,table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.200700312 | International search | [X]US5391626 (MACHIDA SHUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-31 * See abstract; column 3, lines 27-29; column 12, lines 25-54; column 13, lines 8-9; column 17, lines 36-47. *; | [A]KR100935863B (IND ACADEMIC COOP [KR]) [A] 1-34* See abstract; paragraphs [0032] and [0042]; and claims 1-15. *; | [A]KR20100070380 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP]) [A] 1-34 * See abstract; paragraphs [0103]-[0117]; and claims 1-7. *; | [XA]US2011186544 (ENDOU MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 6, 15, 32-34 * See abstract; paragraphs [0071]-[0077]; claim 21; and figures 5A-5D, 6A and 6B. * [A] 1-5, 7-14, 16-31; | [A]KR20130094264 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * See abstract; paragraph [0032]; claims 1-17; and table 1. * |