EP3201451 - A TURBOMACHINERY ASSEMBLY FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE USING A VENTURI APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boost Mechanics (Pty) Limited The Innovation Hub 1 Mark Shuttleworth Street Innovation Centre 0087 Pretoria / ZA | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHEBULA, Ipeleng Samson c/o Lever And George Roads Katara 142 1687 Midrand / ZA | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2020/12] |
Former [2017/32] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15845957.8 | 28.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015IB57418 | Priority number, date | ZA20140007070 | 29.09.2014 Original published format: ZA 201407070 | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016051324 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3201451 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3201451 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/16, F01N3/34 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
F02M35/10118 (EP,US);
F02B29/045 (EP,US);
F02B37/16 (EP,US);
F02B37/168 (EP,US);
F02B37/225 (EP,US);
F02B37/24 (EP,US);
F02D41/0007 (US);
F02M35/10157 (EP,US);
F02M35/1038 (EP,US);
F01N2470/30 (EP,US);
F01N3/101 (EP,US);
F01N3/34 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | F02B37/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBOMASCHINENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT VENTURI-VORRICHTUNG | [2017/32] | English: | A TURBOMACHINERY ASSEMBLY FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE USING A VENTURI APPARATUS | [2017/32] | French: | ENSEMBLE TURBOMACHINE POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE UTILISANT UN APPAREIL VENTURI | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 07.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2015 | AL | 18.03.2020 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | IE | 28.09.2020 | LU | 28.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | FR | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 28.09.2015 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.09.2015 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0617646 (KUBOTA KK) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-6 *; | [XA]US6543428 (BLANDINO JOSEPH A [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 5, line 14 - line 33 * * column 7, line 30 - line 42 * [A] 2-14; | [Y]US2010000204 (HEMSLEY GEOFFREY V [US]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2934324 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2479618 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** figure 2 *; | [Y]US2013081391 (VIJAYARAGHAVAN SHRIRAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US7779634 (BARTHELET PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4 * , entire document, especially Figs. 2, 7, col: 3-4, 7 *; | [A]US2011155108 (RUSS STEPHEN GEORGE [US]) [A] 1-4* , entire document *; | [A]US8272215 (SHU YONG [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * , entire document *; | [A]US2013232971 (MIAZGOWICZ KEITH D [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * , entire document * |