13.09.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
27.05.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.09.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
14.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
04.05.2018 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
15.01.2018 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.12.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
01.12.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
15.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
07.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
07.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
15.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.04.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
11.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|