Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2963246 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US52837 | 29.09.2015 | US201414501815 | 30.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3201937 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2018 | A4 | EP3201937 | 09.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US52837 | 29.09.2015 | US201414501815 | 30.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017003858 | 29.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US52837 | 29.09.2015 | US201414501815 | 30.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016053972 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414501815 | 30.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016093410 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2016 | A1 | US9299465 | 29.03.2016 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201414501815 | 30.09.2014 |