EP3201122 - MICROMACHINED ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCERS WITH A SLOTTED MEMBRANE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InvenSense, Inc. 1745 Technology Drive Suite 200 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2022/38] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Chirp Microsystems Inc. PH Level Skydeck 2150 Shattuck Avenue Berkeley, CA 94704 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUEDES, Andre c/o Chirp Microsystems PH Level Skydeck 2150 Shattuck Avenue Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 02 /
HORSLEY, David c/o Chirp Microsystems PH Level Skydeck 2150 Shattuck Avenue Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 03 /
KIANG, Meng-Hsiung c/o Chirp Microsystems PH Level Skydeck 2150 Shattuck Avenue Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 04 /
PRZYBYLA, Richard c/o Chirp Microsystems PH Level Skydeck 2150 Shattuck Avenue Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 05 /
SHELTON, Stefon c/o Chirp Microsystems PH Level Skydeck 2150 Shattuck Avenue Berkeley, California 94704 / US | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2017/32] | Casey, Alan Michael FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 15846584.9 | 01.10.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015US53605 | Priority number, date | US201462058909P | 02.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462058909 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016054447 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3201122 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3201122 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B81B3/00, H01L41/04, H01L41/113, G01N29/24, G10K9/125, G10K13/00, B06B1/06 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
B06B1/0603 (EP,US);
B06B1/0625 (US);
B81B3/00 (US);
B81B3/0072 (EP,US);
G01N29/2437 (EP,US);
G10K13/00 (EP,US);
G10K9/125 (EP,US);
H03H9/2447 (EP,US);
H10N30/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | B81B3/00, H01L41/04, H01L41/113, G01N29/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROBEARBEITETE ULTRASCHALLWANDLER MIT EINER GESCHLITZTEN MEMBRANSTRUKTUR | [2017/32] | English: | MICROMACHINED ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCERS WITH A SLOTTED MEMBRANE STRUCTURE | [2017/32] | French: | TRANSDUCTEURS ULTRASONIQUES MICRO-USINÉS AYANT UNE STRUCTURE DE MEMBRANE À FENTES | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 05.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | AT | 28.12.2022 | CZ | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | ES | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | IT | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | NL | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3214789 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS59144997U (-) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]JPS61150499 (SAWAFUJI DYNAMECA CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XAI]US2006186762 (SUGIURA MAKIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0046] - [0068] * [A] 7,12 [I] 3; | [A]EP2362686 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2012250909 (GROSH KARL [US], et al) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XAI]US2012266675 (HUFFMAN JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0009] , [0032] - [0040] * [A] 6,11 [I] 3; | [A]EP2519030 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2015131083 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [XP] 1,2,4-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] - [0036] , [0043] - [0050] * | International search | [A]US2001009587 (NIEDERDRANK TORSTEN [DE]) [A] 1-48 * , entire document *; | [A]US6535612 (CROFT III JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * , entire document, especially; col. 7, In 41-54 *; | [A]JP2005210172 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-48* , entire document *; | [A]US2005215907 (TODA MINORU [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * , entire document, especially; para [0047], [0048], [0053] *; | [A]US2007089516 (KHURI-YAKUB BUTRUS T [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * , enlire document, especially; para [0023] *; | [A]JP2011004129 (UNIV TOKYO, et al) [A] 1-48 * , entire document, especially; Abstract *; | [A]US2012250909 (GROSH KARL [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * , entire document, especially; para [0012], [0021], [0024] *; | [A]US2013270967 (DAUSCH DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * , entire document, especially; para [0010] * | by applicant | US2012250909 |