14.10.2022 |
Refusal of application |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
27.06.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
20.06.2022 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
21.04.2022 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
20.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.10.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.10.2020 |
First examination report |
|
25.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
27.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.04.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
13.04.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
13.04.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
01.12.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
01.12.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
04.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
07.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
07.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
20.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
03.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|