EP3203359 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING REMARK INFORMATION RELATED TO IMAGE, AND TERMINAL THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Jiayan A3 Building No.185 Kexue Avenue Science City Luogang District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Weixiong A3 Building No.185 Kexue Avenue Science City Luogang District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 03 /
PARK, Jae-sun 615-1604 30 Bongyeong-ro 1517beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16699 / KR | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15847580.6 | 04.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015KR09380 | Priority number, date | CN201410521223 | 30.09.2014 Original published format: CN201410521223 | [2017/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016052874 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3203359 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F1/16, G06F3/048 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/1423 (CN,US);
G06F1/1647 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (EP,US);
G06F40/169 (US);
G06F2203/04804 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | G06F3/048, G06F3/0488 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ANMERKUNGSINFORMATIONEN BEZÜGLICH EINES BILDES UND ENDGERÄT DAFÜR | [2017/32] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING REMARK INFORMATION RELATED TO IMAGE, AND TERMINAL THEREFOR | [2017/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMENTAIRES RELATIVES À UNE IMAGE ET TERMINAL ASSOCIÉ | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2017 | Translation filed | 02.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 02.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.11.2022 | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/46] | 08.07.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/46] | 11.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2426597 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0137]; figure 13 * * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0172]; figure 17 * * paragraph [0179] - paragraph [0183]; figure 19 *; | [X]US2014164976 (KIM JEONG-HUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-14* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2011081952 (SONG YOO-MEE [KR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraph [0120]; and figures 6D-6E. *; | [Y]EP2428866 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0019], [0023]; and figure 3A. *; | [A]KR20120113738 (COOLIRIS INC [US]) [A] 1-20* See paragraph [0062]; and figure 10. *; | [Y]KR20130039226 (FASOO COM CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6, 18 * See paragraph [0046]; and figure 7. *; | [Y]KR20140046329 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 8-10, 19 * See paragraphs [0132], [02316-[0217]; and figures 7, 11. * |