EP3202395 - SOFT CAPSULE SHELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/32] | SOFT CAPSULE COATING FILM | ||
[2018/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Capsule Co., Ltd. 4242-1, Kitayama Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka 418-0112 / JP | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Kazuhiko c/o FUJI CAPSULE CO., LTD. 4242-1 Kitayama Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka 418-0112 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Yosuke c/o FUJI CAPSULE CO., LTD. 4242-1 Kitayama Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka 418-0112 / JP | 03 /
SHIMOKAWA, Yoshiyuki c/o FUJI CAPSULE CO., LTD. 4242-1 Kitayama Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka 418-0112 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Kenji c/o FUJI CAPSULE CO., LTD. 4242-1 Kitayama Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka 418-0112 / JP | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15847633.3 | 01.10.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015JP77926 | Priority number, date | JP20140204561 | 03.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014204561 | [2017/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016052699 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202395 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3202395 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K47/36, A61K9/62, A61K8/11, A23P10/30, C08L3/04, C08L3/10, C08L5/00, A61Q19/00, A61K8/73 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
A61K47/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/4816 (EP,KR,US);
C08L3/04 (US);
A23L29/256 (US);
A23P10/30 (EP,US);
A61K8/0204 (US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
B01J13/04 (US);
B29D22/00 (US);
C08L3/10 (US);
C08L5/00 (US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
A61K2800/10 (EP,US);
B29K2003/00 (US);
B29K2405/00 (US);
C08L2201/06 (US);
C08L2203/02 (US);
C08L2205/025 (US);
C08L2205/03 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | A61K9/48, A61K47/36, A61K9/62, A61K8/11, A23P10/30, C08L3/04, C08L3/10, C08L5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2017/32] | A61K9/62, A61K47/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHKAPSELHÜLLE | [2018/51] | English: | SOFT CAPSULE SHELL | [2018/51] | French: | ENVELOPPE DE CAPSULE MOLLE | [2018/51] |
Former [2017/32] | WEICHKAPSELBESCHICHTUNGSFILM | ||
Former [2017/32] | SOFT CAPSULE COATING FILM | ||
Former [2017/32] | FILM D'ENROBAGE DE CAPSULE MOLLE | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2017 | Translation filed | 16.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 16.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2015 | AL | 19.12.2018 | AT | 19.12.2018 | CY | 19.12.2018 | CZ | 19.12.2018 | DK | 19.12.2018 | EE | 19.12.2018 | FI | 19.12.2018 | HR | 19.12.2018 | LT | 19.12.2018 | LV | 19.12.2018 | MC | 19.12.2018 | MK | 19.12.2018 | MT | 19.12.2018 | NL | 19.12.2018 | PL | 19.12.2018 | RO | 19.12.2018 | RS | 19.12.2018 | SE | 19.12.2018 | SI | 19.12.2018 | SK | 19.12.2018 | SM | 19.12.2018 | TR | 19.12.2018 | BG | 19.03.2019 | NO | 19.03.2019 | GR | 20.03.2019 | IS | 19.04.2019 | PT | 19.04.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 01.10.2015 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 01.10.2015 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 19.12.2018 | |
NO | 19.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002081331 (TANNER KEITH EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0046] - [0054] * * claims 1,2 *; | [AD]JP2011026262 (NAKANIHON CAPSULE CO LTD) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * * claim 1 *; | [A]JP2013040217 (FUJI CAPSULE KK) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * example -; claim - *; | [A] - R. HOOVER ET AL, "The Effect of Heat-Moisture Treatment on the Structure and Physicochemical Properties of Normal Maize, Waxy Maize, Dull Waxy Maize and Amylomaize V Starches", JOURNAL OF CEREAL SCIENCE., GB, (199603), vol. 23, no. 2, doi:10.1006/jcrs.1996.0015, ISSN 0733-5210, pages 153 - 162, XP055463126 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jcrs.1996.0015 | International search | [A]JP2001275585 (SANWA KOSAN KK) [A] 1-9 * , claims; examples; table 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011026262 (NAKANIHON CAPSULE CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , claims; tables 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013040217 (FUJI CAPSULE KK) [A] 1-9 * , claims; examples & WO 2012/070577 A1 & KR 10-2013-0096628 A *; | [A]JP2014015431 (NAKANIHON CAPSULE CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , claims; table 1, S2 (Family: none) *; | [EX]JP2015189684 (NAKANIHON CAPSULE CO LTD) [EX] 1-4, 8, 9* , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [A] - HOLMES, MALCOLM GLENNIE et al., "STUDIES ON BARLEY AND MALT WITH THE RAPID VISCOANALYSER: [I] THE EFFECT OF VARIATIONS IN PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL PARAMETERS", J. Inst. Brew., (19950000), vol. 101, ISSN 2050-0416, pages 11 - 18, XP055424725 [A] 1-9 * , left column, 'Rapid viscoanalysis', 2nd paragraph, lines 4 to 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/j.2050-0416.1995.tb00844.x |